Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 04/08/2021 at 02:55:37 (UTC).

Sharon P. Jarvis et al. vs Koe Keonorasak; all other persons unknown

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 Sharon P Jarvis filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Koe Keonorasak all other persons unknown. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Holly, Carter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1767

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Holly, Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jarvis, Sharon P.

The Sharon P. Jarvis Separate Property Trust

Sharon P. Javis, trustee of the Sharon P. Jarvis Separate Property Trust

Defendant

Koe Keonorasak; all other persons unknown, claiming any legal or equitable right, title, estate, lien, or interest in the property described in this complaint which is adverse to Plaintiff's Title or creates any cloud on Plaintiff's Title

 

Court Documents

Notice to Filing Party

03/09/2021: Notice to Filing Party

Notice of pendency of action

Notice of pendency of action signed by Judge Holly filed by Sharon P. Jarvis. Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

Complaint

Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Sharon P. Javis, trustee of the Sharon P. Jarvis Separate Property Trust; The Sharon P. Jarvis Separate Property Trust; Jarvis, Sharon P.. Action Type: Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Sharon P. Javis, trustee of the Sharon P. Jarvis Separate Property Trust; The Sharon P. Jarvis Separate Property Trust; Jarvis, Sharon P.. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10B; Judge: Carter Holly; Participant: Koe Keonorasak; all other persons unknown, claiming any legal or equitable right, title, estate, lien, or interest in the property described in this complaint which is adverse to Plaintiff's Title or creates any cloud on Plaintiff's Title (Defendant); Participant: Sharon P. Jarvis (Plaintiff); Participant: Sharon P. Javis, trustee of the Sharon P. Jarvis Separate Property Trust (Plaintiff); Participant: The Sharon P. Jarvis Separate Property Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of pendency of action signed by Judge Holly filed by Sharon P. Jarvis. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 08/26/2021 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 10B. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Sharon P. Javis, trustee of the Sharon P. Jarvis Separate Property Trust; The Sharon P. Jarvis Separate Property Trust; Jarvis, Sharon P.. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Sharon P. Javis, trustee of the Sharon P. Jarvis Separate Property Trust; The Sharon P. Jarvis Separate Property Trust; Jarvis, Sharon P.. Action Type: Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Sharon Jarvis in the amount of $225.00. Receipt number 625404. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less