This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/20/2018 at 10:35:50 (UTC).

Sharon Johnson vs Thomas Johnson

Case Summary

On 02/23/2016 Sharon Johnson filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Thomas Johnson. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Appel, Robin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0870

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Family Law Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Appel, Robin

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Johnson, Sharon

Respondent

Johnson, Thomas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Sonnenberg, Ranette Aileen

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2018
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment filed. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • Family Law Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Separation filed by Johnson, Sharon. Action Type: Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Separation; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • Appearance, Stipulations, and Waiver-No Fee filed by Johnson, Sharon. Action Type: Appearance, Stipulations, and Waiver-No Fee; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure filed by Johnson, Thomas. Action Type: Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Income and Expense Declaration filed by Johnson, Thomas. Action Type: Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration filed by Johnson, Thomas. Action Type: Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration filed by Johnson, Sharon. Action Type: Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Income and Expense Declaration filed by Johnson, Sharon. Action Type: Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2017
  • Response and Request for Disso/Legal/Nulity filed by Johnson, Thomas. Action Type: Response and Request for Disso/Legal/Nulity; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jursidiction and Enforcement Act filed by Johnson, Sharon. Action Type: Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jursidiction and Enforcement Act (UCCJEA) GC-120; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • Amended Petition filed by Johnson, Sharon. Action Type: Amended Petition; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Thomas Johnson filed. Served on 02/23/2016. Method of Service: Personal Service Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Summons issued and filed. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing - Granted as to Sharon Johnson filed. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Petition for Legal Separation filed by Johnson, Sharon. Action Type: Petition for Legal Separation; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Johnson, Sharon. Action Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act filed by . Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less