This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 09/18/2023 at 08:06:01 (UTC).

Sharon Gray vs Stockton Unified School District

Case Summary

On 02/14/2022 Sharon Gray filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Stockton Unified School District. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee, Jayne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1108

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lee, Jayne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gray, Sharon

Defendant

Stockton Unified School District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Biegler, Robert P

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Gray, Sharon.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gray, Sharon.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Gray, Sharon.

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 08/12/2022 08:30 AM .

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Gray, Sharon.

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Proof of Service/ Publication held on 12/09/2022 08:30 AM .

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Proof of Service/ Publication held on 03/07/2023 08:30 AM .

Order to Show Cause (CCP 177.5)

03/09/2023: Order to Show Cause (CCP 177.5)

Declaration

Declaration in Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Gray, Sharon.

Declaration

Declaration in Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Gray, Sharon.

Declaration

Declaration in Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Gray, Sharon.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Gray, Sharon.

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for Court's OSC Re: Failure to Appear held on 05/10/2023 08:30 AM .

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Gray, Sharon.

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 09/05/2023 08:30 AM .

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: CMC: Further Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10C; Judge: Jayne Lee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: CMC: Further Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10C; Result: Held; Judge: Jayne Lee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2023
  • DocketHearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference file and serve FAC, set for 12/05/2023 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 09/05/2023 08:30 AM .; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2023
  • DocketHearing re: CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on September 5, 2023.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Gray, Sharon.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketHearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 09/05/2023 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Court's OSC Re: Failure to Appear; Court Room: 10C; Result: Held; Judge: Jayne Lee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Court's OSC Re: Failure to Appear held on 05/10/2023 08:30 AM .; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketHearing re: Court's OSC Re: Failure to Appear held on May 10, 2023.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketHearing re: Case Management Conference held on August 12, 2022.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Gray, Sharon.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 08/12/2022 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Gray, Sharon.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gray, Sharon.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketPayment received by Sharon Gray in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 716666.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketAttorney, Robert P Biegler, retained for Sharon Gray .; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less