This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/09/2021 at 05:27:54 (UTC).

Shannon R Esenwein vs Daniel C Esenwein

Case Summary

On 10/05/2020 Shannon R Esenwein filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Daniel C Esenwein. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************3994

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Esenwein, Shannon R

Claimants

San Luis Obispo County Pension (SLOCPT)

Stanislaus County Employees Retirement Association

Calpers

Respondent

Esenwein, Daniel C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Stroup, Valerie Christine

Claimant Attorney

Silva, Fred A

Respondent Attorney

Metzinger, Lindsay G

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Appearance and Response of Employee Benefit Plan filed by Stanislaus County Employees Retirement Association. Action Type: Notice of Appearance and Response of Employee Benefit Plan; Judge: Unassigned,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Fred A Silva, retained for Stanislaus County Employees Retirement Association . Judge: Unassigned,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration filed by Esenwein, Shannon R. Action Type: Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Unassigned,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration filed by Esenwein, Shannon R. Action Type: Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Unassigned,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketAmended Response and Request for Disso/Legal/Nulity (No Fee) filed by Esenwein, Daniel C. Action Type: Response and Request for Disso/Legal/Nulity (No Fee); Judge: Unassigned,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgement of Receipt filed by Esenwein, Shannon R. Action Type: Notice and Acknowledgement of Receipt; Judge: Unassigned,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketProof of service filed by Calpers. Action Type: Proof of Service by Mail; Judge: Unassigned,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Appearance and Response of Employee Benefit Plan filed by Calpers. Action Type: Notice of Appearance and Response of Employee Benefit Plan; Judge: Unassigned,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgement of Receipt filed by Esenwein, Shannon R. Action Type: Notice and Acknowledgement of Receipt; Judge: Unassigned,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketAttorney, Lindsay G Metzinger, retained for Daniel C Esenwein . Judge: Unassigned,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketRequest for Joinder of Employee Benefit Plan Order filed by Esenwein, Shannon R re Stanislaus County Employees Retirement Association. Action Type: Request for Joinder of Employee Benefit Plan Order; Judge: Unassigned,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketSummons for Joinder Issued and filed by Esenwein, Shannon R re San Luis Obispo County Pension (SLOCPT). Action Type: Request for Joinder of Employee Benefit Plan Order; Judge: Unassigned,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketPleading on Joinder Employee Benefit Plan filed by Esenwein, Shannon R re San Luis Obispo County Pension (SLOCPT). Action Type: Request for Joinder of Employee Benefit Plan Order; Judge: Unassigned,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketRequest for Joinder of Employee Benefit Plan Order filed by Esenwein, Shannon R re San Luis Obispo County Pension (SLOCPT). Action Type: Request for Joinder of Employee Benefit Plan Order; Judge: Unassigned,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Judge: Unassigned,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketPayment received by Valerie Stroup in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 591673. Judge: Unassigned,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketAttorney, Valerie Christine Stroup, retained for Shannon R Esenwein . Judge: Unassigned,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketDeclaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act (UCCJEA) filed by Esenwein, Shannon R. Judge: Unassigned,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by Esenwein, Shannon R. Action Type: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage; Judge: Unassigned,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Unassigned,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less