Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 23:33:20 (UTC).

Shady Acres Properties LLC vs Autumn Tinney

Case Summary

On 11/22/2016 Shady Acres Properties LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Autumn Tinney. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************1842

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shady Acres Properties LLC

Defendant

Tinney, Autumn

 

Court Documents

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Court Judgment filed by Shady Acres Properties LLC. Action Type: Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

FW001 Request to Waive Court Fees

Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Tinney, Autumn. Action Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Order

Order for Temporary Stay as to Autumn Tinney Denied and filed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Ex Parte Application for Temporary Stay of Execution of Unlawful Detainer Judgment

Ex Parte Application for Temporary Stay of Eviction filed by Tinney, Autumn. Action Type: Ex Parte Application for Temporary Stay of Eviction; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Shady Acres Properties LLC against Autumn Tinney filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Declaration for Issuance of Writ of Possession pursuant to CCP 712.010

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Shady Acres Properties LLC. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Autumn Tinney Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Autumn Tinney served on 11/22/2016 by Personal Service. $30.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585

Declaration in Lieu of Testimony filed by Shady Acres Properties LLC. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

EJ130 Writ of Execution

Writ of Possession as to Autumn Tinney served on 01/03/2017 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

FW003 Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Autumn Tinney. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment AS TO ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS filed by Shady Acres Properties LLC. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of service AS TO ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS filed by Shady Acres Properties LLC. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Notice to Filing Party

Proof of service AS TO ANSWER filed by Tinney, Autumn. ANSWER NOT FILED AS NO PAYMENT OR FEE WAIVER SUBMITTED Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS040 Proof of Service

Proof of service AS TO ANSWER filed by Tinney, Autumn. ANSWER NOT FILED AS NO PAYMENT OR FEE WAIVER SUBMITTED Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Shady Acres Properties LLC. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment for Money After Possession - UD entered and filed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration in Lieu of Testimony filed by Shady Acres Properties LLC. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Entry of Court Judgment filed by Shady Acres Properties LLC. Action Type: Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession as to Autumn Tinney served on 01/03/2017 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order for Temporary Stay as to Autumn Tinney Denied and filed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Autumn Tinney. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Tinney, Autumn. Action Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Ex Parte Application for Temporary Stay of Eviction filed by Tinney, Autumn. Action Type: Ex Parte Application for Temporary Stay of Eviction; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration filed by Tinney, Autumn. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of service AS TO ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS filed by Shady Acres Properties LLC. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Autumn Tinney served on 11/22/2016 by Personal Service. $30.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed by Shady Acres Properties LLC. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of service AS TO ANSWER filed by Tinney, Autumn. ANSWER NOT FILED AS NO PAYMENT OR FEE WAIVER SUBMITTED Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • Payment received by Shady Acres Properties LLC in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 121727. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Shady Acres Properties LLC. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Shady Acres Properties LLC. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less