This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 02/24/2021 at 03:24:07 (UTC).

Sedgwick Claims management Services, Inc. for Starstone National Insurance Company vs Gwen Hodson

Case Summary

On 07/14/2020 Sedgwick Claims management Services, Inc for Starstone National Insurance Company filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Gwen Hodson. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Holly, Carter and Abdallah, George J.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************5950

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judges

Holly, Carter

Abdallah, George J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sedgwick Claims management Services, Inc. for Starstone National Insurance Company

Defendant

Hodson, Gwen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Schoeck, Michael D.

Defendant Attorney

Alley, Ryan W.

 

Court Documents

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Sedgwick Claims management Services, Inc. for Starstone National Insurance Company. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

Order

Case has been consolidated. Controlling case number is STK-CV-UAT-2020-4449. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

answer

Answer To Unverified Complaint And Demand For Jury Trial filed by Hodson, Gwen. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Abdallah, George J..

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 01/11/2021 at 8:45 AM before Hon. George J. Abdallah in Department 10A. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

Notice of Reassignment of Judicial Officer

10/23/2020: Notice of Reassignment of Judicial Officer

Order

Order on Notice of Related Cases, CRC 3.300(h) signed by Judge Abdallah on 10/23/2020 filed by Sedgwick Claims management Services, Inc. for Starstone National Insurance Company. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

notice of related case

Notice of Related Case filed by Sedgwick Claims management Services, Inc. for Starstone National Insurance Company. Action Type: Notice of Related Case; Judge: Holly, Carter.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Gwen Hodson served on 09/28/2020 by Personal Service. $685.00. Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice

Notice of Action Pursuant to Labor Code Section 3853 filed by Sedgwick Claims management Services, Inc. for Starstone National Insurance Company. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Sedgwick Claims management Services, Inc. for Starstone National Insurance Company. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Sedgwick Claims management Services, Inc. for Starstone National Insurance Company. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10A; Result: Vacated; Judge: George J. Abdallah; Participant: Gwen Hodson (Defendant); Participant: Sedgwick Claims management Services, Inc. for Starstone National Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10B; Result: Vacated; Judge: Carter Holly; Participant: Gwen Hodson (Defendant); Participant: Sedgwick Claims management Services, Inc. for Starstone National Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketPayment received by Inc. Sedgwick Claims management Services in the amount of $20.00. Receipt number 609086.(entered in error; should be for CV-2020-4449) rlg Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Sedgwick Claims management Services, Inc. for Starstone National Insurance Company. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase has been consolidated. Controlling case number is STK-CV-UAT-2020-4449. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketCase status updated to Closed. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketHearing Result: CMC Vacated Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketPayment received by Gwen Hodson in the amount of $150.00. Receipt number 598215. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketAttorney, Ryan W. Alley, retained for Gwen Hodson . Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer To Unverified Complaint And Demand For Jury Trial filed by Hodson, Gwen. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Related Case filed by Sedgwick Claims management Services, Inc. for Starstone National Insurance Company. Action Type: Notice of Related Case; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Action Pursuant to Labor Code Section 3853 filed by Sedgwick Claims management Services, Inc. for Starstone National Insurance Company. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 01/11/2021 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 10B. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Sedgwick Claims management Services, Inc. for Starstone National Insurance Company. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Sedgwick Claims management Services, Inc. for Starstone National Insurance Company. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketPayment received by Inc. Sedgwick Claims management Services in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 572349. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketAttorney, Michael D. Schoeck, retained for Sedgwick Claims management Services, Inc. for Starstone National Insurance Company . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC. THIRD-PARTY ADMINISTRATOR INSURED BY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHOECK MICHAEL D