This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 08:06:40 (UTC).

Sean Pasinsky et al. vs Amber Burchard et al.

Case Summary

On 02/23/2016 Sean Pasinsky filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Amber Burchard. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ross, Roger. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************2132

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ross, Roger

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Domich, Zachary

Pasinsky, Cassandra

Bates, Hannah

Pasinsky, Sean

Defendants

Takeda Pharmauceuticals America, Inc

Burchard, Amber

Takeda Pharmauceuticals

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brown, Steven L.

Defendant Attorney

Campodonico, James Dominic

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Ross, Roger.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Amended Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Amended Summons; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Pasinsky, Cassandra; Bates, Hannah; Domich, Zachary; Pasinsky, Sean. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Pasinsky, Sean; Pasinsky, Cassandra. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Takeda Pharmauceuticals; Burchard, Amber; Takeda Pharmauceuticals America, Inc. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Sean Pasinsky, Cassandra Pasinsky, Amber Burchard, Takeda Pharmauceuticals, Takeda Pharmauceuticals America, Inc Entered. Judge: Ross, Roger.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Participant entered as to Hannah Bates, Zachary Domich. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Pasinsky, Cassandra; Bates, Hannah; Domich, Zachary; Pasinsky, Sean. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

Stipulation and Order

Stipulation Continuing Case Management Conference & Order entered and filed. Judge: Ross, Roger.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 08/29/2016 08:30 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice of Change of Address

Notice of Change of Address filed by Pasinsky, Sean. Action Type: Notice of Change of Address; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Answer

First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000) filed by Takeda Pharmauceuticals; Burchard, Amber. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

Amendment to Complaint

Amendment to Complaint as to Doe 1 filed by Domich, Zachary; Bates, Hannah; Pasinsky, Cassandra; Pasinsky, Sean. Action Type: Amendment; Judge: Ross, Roger.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2017
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • Hearing Result: CMC Vacated Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Sean Pasinsky, Cassandra Pasinsky, Amber Burchard, Takeda Pharmauceuticals, Takeda Pharmauceuticals America, Inc Entered. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Pasinsky, Cassandra; Pasinsky, Sean. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 03/22/2017 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 13. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation Continuing Case Management Conference & Order entered and filed. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • Payment received by Sean Pasinsky in the amount of $20.00. Receipt number 121484. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Change of Address filed by Pasinsky, Sean. Action Type: Notice of Change of Address; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 12/12/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 13. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2016
  • Attorney, Steven L. Brown, retained for Sean Pasinsky . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Attorney, Steven L. Brown, retained for Zachary Domich . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Pasinsky, Cassandra; Bates, Hannah; Domich, Zachary; Pasinsky, Sean. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Attorney, Steven L. Brown, retained for Hannah Bates . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Pasinsky, Cassandra; Bates, Hannah; Domich, Zachary; Pasinsky, Sean. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Payment received by Brown & Gessell LLP in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 36457. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Attorney, Steven L. Brown, retained for Cassandra Pasinsky . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less