This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 09/22/2023 at 13:06:00 (UTC).

Scott Stephen vs City of Stockton et al.

Case Summary

On 11/29/2022 Scott Stephen filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against City of Stockton. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee, Jayne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1064

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lee, Jayne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stephen, Scott

Defendants

City of Stockton

Stockton Arena

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sodhi, Jakrun S

Defendant Attorney

Azevedo, Julie M

 

Court Documents

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Stephen, Scott.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Stephen, Scott.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.

Summons - Civil_333389.pdf

11/30/2022: Summons - Civil_333389.pdf

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

Answer

Defendant City of Stockton's Answer to Complaint filed by City of Stockton.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Stockton Arena served on 01/03/2023 by Personal Service. $0.00.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to City of Stockton served on 01/03/2023 by Personal Service. $0.00.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Stephen, Scott.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by City of Stockton.

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 05/31/2023 08:30 AM .

CM-110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Stephen, Scott.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2024
  • HearingHearing Type: Trial Setting Conference; Court Room: 10C; Judge: Jayne Lee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: CMC: Further Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10C; Result: Held; Judge: Jayne Lee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2023
  • DocketHearing regarding: Trial Setting Conference , set for 01/03/2024 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2023
  • DocketHearing re: CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on September 6, 2023.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Stephen, Scott.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • DocketHearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference Answer from Deft, Stkn Arena, set for 09/06/2023 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10C; Result: Held; Judge: Jayne Lee; Participants; City of Stockton (Defendant); Scott Stephen (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 05/31/2023 08:30 AM .; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketHearing re: Case Management Conference held on May 31, 2023.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by City of Stockton.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketAttorney, Julie M Azevedo, retained for City of Stockton .; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefendant City of Stockton's Answer to Complaint filed by City of Stockton.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 05/31/2023 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Stephen, Scott.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Stephen, Scott.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketPayment received by Scott Stephen in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 792185.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketAttorney, Jakrun S Sodhi, retained for Scott Stephen .; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less