This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 10/02/2022 at 11:28:27 (UTC).

Sarah Schurkamp et al. vs General Motors, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/26/2022 Sarah Schurkamp filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against General Motors, LLC. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Waters, Robert T.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************6442

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Waters, Robert T.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Schurkamp, Ernest

Schurkamp, Sarah

Defendant

General Motors, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dolin, Tionna

Defendant Attorney

Arens, Mary Lynn

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Schurkamp, Sarah; Schurkamp, Ernest.

cm-010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Schurkamp, Sarah; Schurkamp, Ernest.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to General Motors, LLC served on 08/17/2022 by Personal Service. $47.45.

Answer

Answer to Plaintiff's Unverified Complaint filed by General Motors, LLC.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 11B; Judge: Robert T. Waters; Participants; Ernest Schurkamp (Plaintiff); General Motors, LLC (Defendant); Sarah Schurkamp (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketAttorney, Mary Lynn Arens, retained for General Motors, LLC .; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Plaintiff's Unverified Complaint filed by General Motors, LLC.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketPayment received by LLC General Motors in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 771938.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to General Motors, LLC served on 08/17/2022 by Personal Service. $47.45.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 01/23/2023 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Robert T. Waters in Department 11B.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Schurkamp, Sarah; Schurkamp, Ernest.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Schurkamp, Sarah; Schurkamp, Ernest.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketPayment received by Sarah Schurkamp in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 757708.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketAttorney, Tionna Dolin, retained for Ernest Schurkamp .; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketAttorney, Tionna Dolin, retained for Sarah Schurkamp .; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARENS MARY LYNN