This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 06:51:53 (UTC).

Sara Diaz vs Cherokee Retirement Homes et al.

Case Summary

On 02/08/2016 Sara Diaz filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Cherokee Retirement Homes. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ross, Roger. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1322

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ross, Roger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Diaz, Sara

Defendants

Cherokee Retirement Homes

Reed, Rick

Walter, Mary

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Corren, Adam Blair

Defendant Attorney

Chrestionson, Keith

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: CMC: Request for Dismissal , set for 03/22/2018 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Trial Brief

Plaintiff's Trial Brief filed by Diaz, Sara. Action Type: Trial Brief; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Trial management order

Trial Management Order filed. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Order on Motion for Summary Adjudication

Order on Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication filed re Sara Diaz, Cherokee Retirement Homes, Rick Reed, Mary Walter. Judge: Ross, Roger.

MC050 Substitution of Attorney Civil (Without Court Order)

Substitution of Attorney filed by Reed, Rick; Cherokee Retirement Homes. Action Type: Substitution of Attorney; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Reed, Rick; Cherokee Retirement Homes; Walter, Mary. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 08/02/2016 08:30 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Diaz, Sara. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

FW003 Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Sara Diaz filed. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Motion

Plaintiff's Motion in Limine filed by Diaz, Sara. Action Type: Motion in Limine; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice of Entry of Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order filed. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Order; Judge: Ross, Roger.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Motion for Summary Judgment/Adj. held on 07/18/2017 09:00 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

TentativeRuling/ProbateNote.rtf

Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Plaintiff's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment or for Summary Adjudication filed by Diaz, Sara. Action Type: Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Diaz, Sara. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Diaz, Sara. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Cherokee Retirement Homes; Walter, Mary; Reed, Rick. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Cherokee Retirement Homes served on 02/17/2016. Type of Service Personal. $40.00. Judge: Ross, Roger.

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2018
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Request for Dismissal , set for 02/08/2019 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • CMC: Request for Dismissal scheduled on 03/22/2018 at 8:30 AM has been Continued. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference Order continuing the CMC re Dismissal date from 3/22/18 to 2/8/19 filed re Sara Diaz. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Case status updated to Conditional Settlement. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Request for Dismissal , set for 03/22/2018 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Settlement - Conditional filed by Diaz, Sara. Action Type: Notice of Settlement - Conditional; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • Hearing Result: Dropped (Parties will be filing a Notice of Settlement.) Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • Request for Dismissal filed by Diaz, Sara. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 08/28/2017 01:30 PM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Court Trial Est 2 days, set for 01/22/2018 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Cherokee Retirement Homes served on 02/17/2016. Type of Service Personal. $40.00. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 08/02/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 13. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Sara Diaz filed. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Diaz, Sara. Action Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Diaz, Sara. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Diaz, Sara. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • Attorney, Adam Blair Corren, retained for Sara Diaz . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less