This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2022 at 02:02:22 (UTC).

Saquana Williams, individually and as personal representative of The Estate of Arlanders Atkins II et al. vs Tyrone Johnson et al.

Case Summary

On 12/01/2021 Saquana Williams, individually and as personal representative of The Estate of Arlanders Atkins II filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Tyrone Johnson. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee, Jayne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0991

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lee, Jayne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Saquana Williams, individually and as personal representative of The Estate of Arlanders Atkins II

Defendants

Gilbert, Tyrone Deandre

Harris, Shaniece Safeya

Johnson, Tyrone

Roots, Donald

Cross Plaintiff

Safeya Harris, Shaneice

Cross Defendant

Saquana Williams individually and as personal representative of The Estate of Arlanders Atkins, II

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

Goins, Vernon C. II

 

Court Documents

Notice of Motion

Notice of Motion and Motion to Set Aside Default and Default Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration of Tyrone Johnson filed by Johnson, Tyrone.

FW003 Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Tyrone Johnson.

Proof of Service

Proof of service as to Cross-Complaint filed by Safeya Harris, Shaneice. *No Summons Issued.

Proof of Service

Proof of service as to Shaneice Safeya Harris' Answer to Unverified Complaint filed by Safeya Harris, Shaneice.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Tyrone Deandre Gilbert Entered

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Shaniece Safeya Harris Not Entered

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Tyrone Johnson EnteredSet Aside per order signed 5/18/22

Answer

Answer to Unverified Complaint (amount over $25,000) filed by Harris, Shaniece Safeya.

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by Safeya Harris, Shaneice.

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: CMC: Further Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10C; Judge: Jayne Lee; Participants; Donald Roots (Defendant); Saquana Williams individually and as personal representative of The Estate of Arlanders Atkins, II (Cross-Defendant); Saquana Williams, individually and as personal representative of The Estate of Arlanders Atkins II (Plaintiff); Shaneice Safeya Harris (Cross-Complainant); Shaniece Safeya Harris (Defendant); Tyrone Deandre Gilbert (Defendant); Tyrone Johnson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 08/23/2022 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10C; Result: Held; Judge: Jayne Lee; Participants; Donald Roots (Defendant); Saquana Williams, individually and as personal representative of The Estate of Arlanders Atkins II (Plaintiff); Shaniece Safeya Harris (Defendant); Tyrone Deandre Gilbert (Defendant); Tyrone Johnson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 05/27/2022 08:30 AM .; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketHearing re: Case Management Conference held on May 27, 2022.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearance filed by Saquana Williams, individually and as personal representative of The Estate of Arlanders Atkins II.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Johnson, Tyrone.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Setting Aside Default signed by Judge Lee filed by Tyrone Johnson.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Motion to Set Aside Default and Judgment; Court Room: 10C; Result: Held; Judge: Jayne Lee; Participants; Tyrone Johnson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Saquana Williams, individually and as personal representative of The Estate of Arlanders Atkins II.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Shaniece Safeya Harris served on 02/06/2022 by Personal Service. $150.00.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Tyrone Johnson served on 01/26/2022 by Substituted Service. $100.00.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 05/27/2022 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Saquana Williams, individually and as personal representative of The Estate of Arlanders Atkins II.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Saquana Williams, individually and as personal representative of The Estate of Arlanders Atkins II.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketPayment received by individually Saquana Williams in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 699996.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Vernon C. Goins II, retained for Saquana Williams, individually and as personal representative of The Estate of Arlanders Atkins II .; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOINS II, VERNON C.