This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:54:41 (UTC).

Santiago & Katie L. Gutierrerz et al. vs Atherton Homes, LLC et al.

Case Summary

On 04/24/2017 Santiago Katie L Gutierrerz filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Atherton Homes, LLC. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Humphreys, Elizabeth and Mulvihill, Michael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************4061

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judges

Humphreys, Elizabeth

Mulvihill, Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jerry & Vanessa Gammon

Sam Abushaban & Hue Adrong

Robert E. & Carson H. Johnson

Santiago & Katie L. Gutierrerz

Henry & Edna Macaraig

Katherine Jean Rodrigues

Powell, Eleanor

Defendant

Atherton Homes, LLC

Cross Defendants

Kenyon Plastering, Inc., a California corporation

Barbosa Cabinets, Inc., a California corporation

L & P Landscaping, Inc., a dissolved California corporation

G & G Construction, a California general partnership

Western Shower Door, Inc., a suspended California corporation

Sturdy Fence Company, Inc., a suspended California corporation

Classic Tile, Inc., a California corporation

Wilden Painting & Decorating, Inc., a suspended California corporation

Valley Distributors, Inc., a California corporation

Alcal/Arcade Contracting, Inc., a Nevada corporation

North Pacific Builders, Inc., a California corporation

Intervenor

AIG Claims, Inc. on behalf of Lexington Insurance Company for Sturdy Fence Company Inc., a suspended corporation

27 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Staffeldt, Jonathan

Fairchild, Michael

Cross Defendant Attorneys

Vairetta, Wendi N

Peterson, Patricia Joan

Hazelton, Troy M.

McElroy, Julie D.

Hutchison, Scott M.

Intervenor Attorney

Doran, James W.

Other Attorneys

Czelusniak, David E.

Lamond, Christian F.

Nordstrom, Adrienne E.

McNeill, Timothy C.

 

Court Documents

Cross Defendant Center Plumbing Company Company's Special Answer to plaintiffs complaint

Cross Defendant Center Plumbing Company Company's Special Answer to plaintiffs complaint filed by Center Plumbing Co., a California corporation. Action Type: Answer; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of service as to elegant surfaces (duplicate) filed by Atherton Woodward Partners, LLC. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Proof of Service

Proof of service filed by Atherton Woodward Partners, LLC; Michael W. Atherton Development, Inc. dba Atherton Homes. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Cross Defendant L&P Landscaping Inc. Answer to Cross Complaint

Cross-Defendant, L&P Landscape, Inc., a Dissolved California Corporation (Roe 10) Answer to the Cross Complaint of Atherton Woodward Partners filed by L & P Landscaping, Inc., a dissolved California corporation. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Motion

Barbosa Cabinets, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Judicial Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed by Barbosa Cabinets, Inc., a California corporation. Action Type: Motion or other paper requesting a hearing; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Application for Order to Serve the Secretary of State Re: Sturdy Fence Company, Inc.filed by Michael W. Atherton Development, Inc. dba Atherton Homes; Atherton Woodward Partners, LLC. Action Type: Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Proof of Service

Proof of service filed by Michael W. Atherton Development, Inc. dba Atherton Homes; Atherton Woodward Partners, LLC. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

Notice of Change of Handling Attorney filed by Center Plumbing Co., a California corporation. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Stipulation and Order

Stipulation & Order of Reference to Special Master entered and filed. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

167 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Jerry & Vanessa Gammon. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Participant entered as to F.G. Edwards & Company, a dissolved California corporation. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • Request for Dismissal filed by Atherton Woodward Partners, LLC. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service filed by Atherton Woodward Partners, LLC. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Change of Address filed by Center Plumbing Co., a California corporation; AIG Claims, Inc. on behalf of Lexington Insurance Company for Sturdy Fence Company Inc., a suspended corporation. Action Type: Notice of Change of Address; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Default against Central Valley Shower Door, Inc., a dissolved California corporation Entered Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • Request for Entry of Default - Civil filed by Atherton Woodward Partners, LLC; Michael W. Atherton Development, Inc. dba Atherton Homes. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service filed by Atherton Homes, LLC. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Default against Central Valley Shower Door, Inc., a dissolved California corporation Not Entered Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Request for Entry of Default as to Central Valley Shower Door, Inc. - Civil filed by Michael W. Atherton Development, Inc. dba Atherton Homes; Atherton Woodward Partners, LLC. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
282 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2017
  • Attorney, Jonathan Staffeldt, retained for Jerry & Vanessa Gammon . Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • Attorney, Jonathan Staffeldt, retained for Katherine Jean Rodrigues . Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • Attorney, Jonathan Staffeldt, retained for Santiago & Katie L. Gutierrerz . Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • Attorney, Jonathan Staffeldt, retained for Sam Abushaban & Hue Adrong . Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Jerry & Vanessa Gammon; Katherine Jean Rodrigues; Robert E. & Carson H. Johnson; Henry & Edna Macaraig; Santiago & Katie L. Gutierrerz; Sam Abushaban & Hue Adrong. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • Payment received by Santiago & Katie L. Gutierrerz in the amount of $1435.00. Receipt number 162332. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • Complex Case Fee (One fee for all Plaintffs) filed by Jerry & Vanessa Gammon; Katherine Jean Rodrigues; Robert E. & Carson H. Johnson; Henry & Edna Macaraig; Santiago & Katie L. Gutierrerz; Sam Abushaban & Hue Adrong. Action Type: Complex Case Fee (One fee for all Plaintffs); Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • Payment received by Santiago & Katie L. Gutierrerz in the amount of $1435.00. Receipt number 162332. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Jerry & Vanessa Gammon; Katherine Jean Rodrigues; Robert E. & Carson H. Johnson; Henry & Edna Macaraig; Santiago & Katie L. Gutierrerz; Sam Abushaban & Hue Adrong. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Valley Distributors, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Sturdy Fence Company, Inc., A California Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where KENYON PLASTERING, INC., is a litigant

Latest cases where ALCAL SPECIALTY CONTRACTING, INC. is a litigant