This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 02/04/2023 at 01:05:27 (UTC).

Sandra Strother vs Herman Strother

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 Sandra Strother filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Herman Strother. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************6106

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Strother, Sandra

Respondent

Strother, Herman

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Request for Order-Initial; Court Room: 4A; Result: Dropped; Judge: Robin Appel; Participants; Herman Strother (Respondent); Sandra Strother (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Request for Order-Initial held on 12/30/2022 08:15 AM .; Judge: Appel, Robin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketHearing Result: Dropped; Judge: Appel, Robin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Herman Strother filed. Served on 12/14/2022. Method of Service: Personal Service; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: Request for Order-Initial Petr's RFO Child Custody, Visitation, Child Support **No POS**, set for 12/30/2022 at 8:15 AM before Hon. Robin Appel in Department 4A.; Judge: Appel, Robin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketPayment received in the amount of $12.50, receipt number 790474.; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketRFO-Request for Order (Initial) filed by Strother, Sandra.; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketFinancial Statement Simplified filed by Strother, Sandra.; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act (UCCJEA) filed by .; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by Strother, Sandra.; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketPayment received by Sandra Strother in the amount of $495.00. Receipt number 790471.; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less