This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/27/2018 at 09:50:28 (UTC).

Sandra A Heaney vs. Lorri Velasco

Case Summary

On 09/26/2013 Sandra A Heaney filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Lorri Velasco. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mulvihill, Michael. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************9848

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mulvihill, Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Heaney, Sandra A

Defendant

Velasco, Lorri

 

Court Documents

Payment Receipt

09/26/2013: Payment Receipt

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process)

09/04/2014: Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process)

Notice that you have been sued

09/26/2013: Notice that you have been sued

Minute Order

10/09/2014: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

10/10/2014

Milestone of Disposition 30 days met late. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2014

Milestone of Disposition 45 days met late. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2014

Matter heard. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2014

Volume updated. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2014

Case disposed with disposition of Court dismissal- Lack of Prosecution. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2014

Status of Sandra Heaney updated to Dismissed with Prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2014

Status of Lorri Velasco updated to Dismissed with Prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2014

Complaint disposed with disposition of Court dismissal- Lack of Prosecution. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2014

Minutes finalized for Motion - Other (CLM) heard 10/09/2014 03:00:00 PM. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2014

The Court orders the entire action dismissed with prejudice . Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
09/26/2013

Cause of Action number 1 added. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2013

Automatic Proof of Service Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2013

Case initiation form printed. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2013

Automatic UD Disposition Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2013

Automatic Failure to File Default Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2013

Summons issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2013

Case assigned to Department M2. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2013

Original Summons filed by Heaney, Sandra A on 09/26/2013. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2013

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Heaney, Sandra A on 09/26/2013. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2013

Complaint filed by Heaney, Sandra A on 09/26/2013. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less