Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:35:57 (UTC).

San Joaquin Marketing Association, a California Corporation vs Diane Ruby, individually and dba Liberty Insurance

Case Summary

On 10/05/2016 San Joaquin Marketing Association, a California Corporation filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against Diane Ruby, individually and dba Liberty Insurance. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0040

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

San Joaquin Marketing Association, a California Corporation

Defendant

Diane Ruby, individually and dba Liberty Insurance

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Coon, Alan Richard

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Judgment for Money After Possession - UD entered and filed. $7988.00 Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Court Judgment filed by San Joaquin Marketing Association, a California Corporation. Action Type: Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Court Judgment filed by San Joaquin Marketing Association, a California Corporation. Action Type: Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

MC010 Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed by San Joaquin Marketing Association, a California Corporation. Action Type: Memorandum of Costs (Summary); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal Does filed by San Joaquin Marketing Association, a California Corporation. Action Type: Request for Dismissal Does; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service of Summons as to Diane Ruby, individually and dba Liberty Insurance served on 11/04/2016 by Personal Service. $40.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Declaration for Issuance of Writ of Possession pursuant to CCP 712.010

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by San Joaquin Marketing Association, a California Corporation. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Correspondence - Received

11/07/2016: Correspondence - Received

Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint for Possession and Damages filed by San Joaquin Marketing Association, a California Corporation. Action Type: Amended Complaint; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Notice to Filing Party

Request for Entry of Court Judgment filed by San Joaquin Marketing Association, a California Corporation. Action Type: Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585

Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by San Joaquin Marketing Association, a California Corporation. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for San Joaquin Marketing Association, a California Corporation against Diane Ruby, individually and dba Liberty Insurance filed and entered Judgment does not apply to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Notice to Filing Party

Request for Default against Diane Ruby, individually and dba Liberty Insurance Not Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Diane Ruby, individually and dba Liberty Insurance Not Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by San Joaquin Marketing Association, a California Corporation. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by San Joaquin Marketing Association, a California Corporation. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2017
  • Abstract of Judgment Issued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • Payment received by a San Joaquin Marketing Association in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 172941. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment for Money After Possession - UD entered and filed. $7988.00 Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Entry of Court Judgment filed by San Joaquin Marketing Association, a California Corporation. Action Type: Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Entry of Court Judgment filed by San Joaquin Marketing Association, a California Corporation. Action Type: Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by San Joaquin Marketing Association, a California Corporation. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Does filed by San Joaquin Marketing Association, a California Corporation. Action Type: Request for Dismissal Does; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed by San Joaquin Marketing Association, a California Corporation. Action Type: Memorandum of Costs (Summary); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • Writ of Possession issued as to Diane Ruby, individually and dba Liberty Insurance on 11/29/2016 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed by San Joaquin Marketing Association, a California Corporation. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Diane Ruby, individually and dba Liberty Insurance served on 11/04/2016 by Personal Service. $40.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Complaint for Possession and Damages filed by San Joaquin Marketing Association, a California Corporation. Action Type: Amended Complaint; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • Attorney, Alan Richard Coon, retained for San Joaquin Marketing Association, a California Corporation . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by San Joaquin Marketing Association, a California Corporation. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by San Joaquin Marketing Association, a California Corporation. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • Payment received by Joaquin San in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 107438. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less