This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 10:01:28 (UTC).

San Joaquin County vs Tairance Kelly

Case Summary

On 04/08/2016 San Joaquin County filed a Labor - Workplace Violence lawsuit against Tairance Kelly. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************3389

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Workplace Violence

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Petitioner

San Joaquin County

Respondent

Tairance Kelly

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Flores, Richard M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2016
  • Hearing Result: Dropped Judge: Sueyres, F. Clark.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • Hearing regarding: OSC Re: Harassment , set for 09/09/2016 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Sheryle Sparks in Department 17. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Respondent's Request for Hearing to Dismiss Workplace Order filed by Tairance Kelly. Action Type: Request - (Other); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration filed by Tairance Kelly.(dismiss workplace TRO) Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Workplace Violence Restraining Order After Hearing filed by San Joaquin County, Tairance Kelly. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • Hearing re: OSC Re: Harassment held on May 6, 2016. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for OSC Re: Harassment held on 05/06/2016 01:30 PM . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Unsuccessful Service filed by Tairance Kelly. Action Type: Affidavit of Unsuccessful Service; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of service for Civil Subpoena as to Monica Moore by Personal Service filed by Tairance Kelly. Served on 4-28-16 by SJ Sheriff Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Personal Service on Temporary Restraining Order filed by San Joaquin County. Action Type: Proof of Personal Service; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • Hearing regarding: OSC Re: Harassment , set for 05/06/2016 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Sheryle Sparks in Department 17. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Court Hearing - Workplace Violence filed by San Joaquin County, Tairance Kelly. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Temporary Restraining Order Granted and filed on 04/12/2016. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by San Joaquin County. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment. Action Type: Petition for Workplace Violence Restraining Order's (with violence); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Workplace Violence Restraining Order's (with violence) filed by San Joaquin County. Action Type: Petition for Workplace Violence Restraining Order's (with violence); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • Attorney, Richard M Flores, retained for San Joaquin County . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • Notice of Case Assignment. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less