This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 04:59:28 (UTC).

Samuel Bowen vs IMI Material Handling Logistics Inc., a Nevada corporation

Case Summary

On 01/08/2016 Samuel Bowen filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against IMI Material Handling Logistics Inc , a Nevada corporation. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0192

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Samuel Bowen, on behalf of himself and all current and former aggrieved employees pursuant to the Labor Code Private Attorneys General Act of 2004, Labor Code 2698 et seq.

Defendant

IMI Material Handling Logistics Inc., a Nevada corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Katofsky, Alex Paul

Defendant Attorney

Patterson, Julie E.

 

Court Documents

Order

Order Granting Final Approval of class Action Settlement filed by Samuel Bowen, on behalf of himself and all current and former aggrieved employees pursuant to the Labor Code Private Attorneys General Act of 2004, Labor Code 2698 et seq.. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

TentativeRuling/ProbateNote.rtf

Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Notice of Motion

Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Samuel Bowen, on behalf of himself and all current and former aggrieved employees pursuant to the Labor Code Private Attorneys General Act of 2004, Labor Code 2698 et seq.. Action Type: Motion or other paper requesting a hearing; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Motion held on 01/19/2017 09:00 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Declaration

Declaration of Daniel F. Gaines in Support of Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Samuel Bowen, on behalf of himself and all current and former aggrieved employees pursuant to the Labor Code Private Attorneys General Act of 2004, Labor Code 2698 et seq.. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Motion

Notice of Unopposed Motion and Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Samuel Bowen, on behalf of himself and all current and former aggrieved employees pursuant to the Labor Code Private Attorneys General Act of 2004, Labor Code 2698 et seq.. Action Type: Motion or other paper requesting a hearing; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by IMI Material Handling Logistics Inc., a Nevada corporation. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Samuel Bowen, on behalf of himself and all current and former aggrieved employees pursuant to the Labor Code Private Attorneys General Act of 2004, Labor Code 2698 et seq.. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to IMI Material Handling Logistics Inc., a Nevada corporation served on 01/14/2016. Type of Service Personal. $80.00. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Declaration in Support

Declaration of Kenneth S. Gaines in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Application for Approval of Attorneys' Fees and Costs, Claims Administration Fees, and Class Representative's Service Payment filed by Samuel Bowen, on behalf of himself and all current and former aggrieved employees pursuant to the Labor Code Private Attorneys General Act of 2004, Labor Code 2698 et seq.. Action Type: Declaration in Support; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 03/17/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Declaration

Declaration of Service filed by Samuel Bowen, on behalf of himself and all current and former aggrieved employees pursuant to the Labor Code Private Attorneys General Act of 2004, Labor Code 2698 et seq.. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Trial Setting Conference held on 11/08/2016 08:45 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Samuel Bowen, on behalf of himself and all current and former aggrieved employees pursuant to the Labor Code Private Attorneys General Act of 2004, Labor Code 2698 et seq.. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Amended Complaint

First Amended Complaint filed by Samuel Bowen, on behalf of himself and all current and former aggrieved employees pursuant to the Labor Code Private Attorneys General Act of 2004, Labor Code 2698 et seq.. Action Type: Amended Complaint; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Stipulation and Order

Stipulation & Order Permitting Filing of First Amended Class Action Complaint entered and filed. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Answer

First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000) filed by IMI Material Handling Logistics Inc., a Nevada corporation. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Samuel Bowen, on behalf of himself and all current and former aggrieved employees pursuant to the Labor Code Private Attorneys General Act of 2004, Labor Code 2698 et seq.. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2017
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Granting Final Approval of class Action Settlement filed by Samuel Bowen, on behalf of himself and all current and former aggrieved employees pursuant to the Labor Code Private Attorneys General Act of 2004, Labor Code 2698 et seq.. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Motion for Approval of Class Settlement held on 06/19/2017 09:00 AM . Judge: Sueyres, F. Clark.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • Hearing Result: Dropped - see minute order. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Samuel Bowen in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Application for Approval of Attorneys' Fees and Costs, Claims Administration Fees, and Class Representative's Service Payment filed by Samuel Bowen, on behalf of himself and all current and former aggrieved employees pursuant to the Labor Code Private Attorneys General Act of 2004, Labor Code 2698 et seq.. Action Type: Declaration in Support; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Application for Approval of Attorneys' Fees and Costs, Claims Administration Fees, and Class Representative's Service Payment filed by Samuel Bowen, on behalf of himself and all current and former aggrieved employees pursuant to the Labor Code Private Attorneys General Act of 2004, Labor Code 2698 et seq.. Action Type: Application - (Other); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Service filed by Samuel Bowen, on behalf of himself and all current and former aggrieved employees pursuant to the Labor Code Private Attorneys General Act of 2004, Labor Code 2698 et seq.. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Julie Stokes of ILYM Group, Inc., in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Samuel Bowen, on behalf of himself and all current and former aggrieved employees pursuant to the Labor Code Private Attorneys General Act of 2004, Labor Code 2698 et seq.. Action Type: Declaration in Support; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Samuel Bowen, on behalf of himself and all current and former aggrieved employees pursuant to the Labor Code Private Attorneys General Act of 2004, Labor Code 2698 et seq.. Action Type: Motion or other paper requesting a hearing; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000) filed by IMI Material Handling Logistics Inc., a Nevada corporation. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • Attorney, Julie E. Patterson, retained for IMI Material Handling Logistics Inc., a Nevada corporation . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to IMI Material Handling Logistics Inc., a Nevada corporation served on 01/14/2016. Type of Service Personal. $80.00. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 07/06/2016 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 42. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Samuel Bowen, on behalf of himself and all current and former aggrieved employees pursuant to the Labor Code Private Attorneys General Act of 2004, Labor Code 2698 et seq.. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Samuel Bowen, on behalf of himself and all current and former aggrieved employees pursuant to the Labor Code Private Attorneys General Act of 2004, Labor Code 2698 et seq.. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • Payment received by River City Process Service in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 21050. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less