This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 12/22/2021 at 09:03:06 (UTC).

Saheba Khurana vs Preet Sandhu

Case Summary

On 10/20/2021 Saheba Khurana filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Preet Sandhu. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Appel, Robin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************4658

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Appel, Robin

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Khurana, Saheba

Respondent

Sandhu, Preet

Not Classified By Court

Wolf - 2019, Sarah

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Medina, Francisco J

Dorn, Jessica

Respondent Attorney

Butler, Dianne Drew

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Request for Order-Modification; Court Room: 4A; Result: Held; Judge: Tameem Mardini; Participant: Preet Sandhu (Respondent); Participant: Saheba Khurana (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Request for Order-Modification held on 12/09/2021 08:15 AM . Judge: Mardini, Tameem.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketHearing re: Request for Order-Modification held on December 9, 2021. Judge: Mardini, Tameem.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketResponsive Declaration to Request for Order (No Fee) filed by Sandhu, Preet. Action Type: Responsive Declaration to Request for Order (No Fee); Judge: Unassigned,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Request for Order-Modification; Court Room: 4A; Result: Continued - Parties Motion; Judge: Robin Appel; Participant: Preet Sandhu (Respondent); Participant: Saheba Khurana (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Order to Continue Hearing as to Saheba Khurana served on 11/29/2021 by Mailing. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Dianne Drew Butler, retained for Preet Sandhu . Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney filed by Sandhu, Preet. Action Type: Substitution of Attorney; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Request for Order-Modification Petr's RFO MOD Child Custody, Visitation, OST *No POS, set for 12/09/2021 at 8:15 AM before Hon. Robin Appel in Department 4A. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketHearing Result: Continued - Parties Motion Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Jessica Dorn in the amount of $85.00. Receipt number 697791. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney filed by Khurana, Saheba. Action Type: Substitution of Attorney; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Preet Sandhu filed. Served on 11/02/2021. Method of Service: Notice of Acknowledgement of Receipt Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketCase associated with case: , STA-FL-DVW-2021-0004452 Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Francisco J Medina, retained for Saheba Khurana . Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act (UCCJEA) filed by Khurana, Saheba. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Saheba Khurana in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 689906. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by Khurana, Saheba. Action Type: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Unassigned,.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Butler, Dianne Drew