This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 03/13/2023 at 09:42:08 (UTC).

Safeway, Inc. et al. vs Victor Lopez

Case Summary

On 02/09/2023 Safeway, Inc filed a Labor - Workplace Violence lawsuit against Victor Lopez. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Manteca Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Agbayani, Tony J.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1132

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Workplace Violence

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Agbayani, Tony J.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Safeway, Inc.

Respondent

Lopez, Victor

Interested Party

Brocklehurst, Lorraine

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Dahlberg, John N.

 

Court Documents

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Safeway, Inc..

WV100 Petition for Workplace Violence Restraining Order

Petition for Workplace Violence Restraining Order's (with violence) filed by Safeway, Inc..

Declaration

Declaration of Safeway Employee Lorraine Brocklehurst in Support of Petition for Workplace Violence Restraining Orders filed by Safeway, Inc..

CivilRestrainingOrderNoticetoFilingParty.rtf

Civil Restraining Order Notice to Filing Party.

WV110 TP Workplace Violence Temporary Restraining Order

Temporary Restraining Order Granted and filed on 02/10/2023.

WV109 Notice of Court Hearing (Workplace Violence Prevention)

Notice of Court Hearing - Workplace Violence filed by Safeway, Inc..

WV200 TP Proof of Service

Proof of Service of Workplace Violence Restraining Order as to Victor Lopez served on 02/11/2023 by Personal Service. $0.00.

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for OSC Re: Harassment held on 03/07/2023 10:30 AM .

WV130 TP Workplace Violence Restraining Order After Hearing

The Court Orders the Restraining Order After Hearing to Stop Harassment (CLETS) (Civil Harassment) Granted on 03/07/2023. See Order filed herein.

CH200 TP Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service of WV-130 Civil Harassment Restraining Order after Hearing as to Victor Lopez served on 03/08/2023 by Mailing. $0.00.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service of WV-130 as to Victor Lopez served on 03/09/2023 by Personal Service. $0.00.

 

Docket Entries

03/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service of WV-130 as to Victor Lopez served on 03/09/2023 by Personal Service. $0.00.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service of WV-130 Civil Harassment Restraining Order after Hearing as to Victor Lopez served on 03/08/2023 by Mailing. $0.00.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2023

HearingHearing Type: OSC Re: Harassment; Court Room: M2; Result: Held; Judge: Tony J. Agbayani

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2023

DocketCase status updated to Disposed.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketThe Court Orders the Restraining Order After Hearing to Stop Harassment (CLETS) (Civil Harassment) Granted on 03/07/2023. See Order filed herein.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2023

DocketHearing re: OSC Re: Harassment held on March 7, 2023.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMinutes finalized for OSC Re: Harassment held on 03/07/2023 10:30 AM .; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service of Workplace Violence Restraining Order as to Victor Lopez served on 02/11/2023 by Personal Service. $0.00.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2023

DocketHearing regarding: OSC Re: Harassment , set for 03/07/2023 at 10:30 AM before Hon. Tony J. Agbayani in Department M2.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Court Hearing - Workplace Violence filed by Safeway, Inc..; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketTemporary Restraining Order Granted and filed on 02/10/2023.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2023

DocketAttorney, John N. Dahlberg, retained for Safeway, Inc. .; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Restraining Order Notice to Filing Party.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2023

DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDeclaration of Safeway Employee Lorraine Brocklehurst in Support of Petition for Workplace Violence Restraining Orders filed by Safeway, Inc..; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPetition for Workplace Violence Restraining Order's (with violence) filed by Safeway, Inc..; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Safeway, Inc..; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less