This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/20/2018 at 10:46:24 (UTC).

Ruth Beach vs Paul Beach

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 Ruth Beach filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Paul Beach. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Agbayani, Tony J.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0915

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Family Law Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Agbayani, Tony J.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Beach, Ruth

Respondent

Beach, Paul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Amaral, Tamran

Respondent Attorney

Maples, Anna Y

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2018
  • Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney of Record filed by Beach, Paul. Action Type: Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney of Record; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • Notice and Acknowledgement of Receipt filed by Beach, Paul. Action Type: Notice and Acknowledgement of Receipt; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • Stipulation for Release of Remaining Funds Being Held in Attorney Anna Y. Maples Trust Account and other Orders entered and filed. Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • Payment received by Ruth Beach in the amount of $20.00. Receipt number 286241. Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment filed. Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Family Law Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • Order After Hearing filed by Ruth Beach, Paul Beach. Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • Judgment On Reserved Issues as to Ruth Beach, Paul Beach Entered. Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Hearing re: Review held on October 2, 2017. Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Minutes finalized for Review held on 10/02/2017 09:00 AM . Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
61 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Paul Beach filed. Served on 02/24/2016. Method of Service: Personal Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing - Granted as to Ruth Beach filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Request for Order-Initial Petr's RFO move out and sale of home, set for 04/08/2016 at 8:15 AM before Hon. Cheryl A. McCann in Department F2. Judge: McCann, Cheryl A..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Summons issued and filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Beach, Ruth. Action Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Attorney, Tamran Amaral, retained for Ruth Beach . Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Income and Expense Declaration filed by Beach, Ruth. Action Type: Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • RFO-Request for Order filed by Beach, Ruth. Action Type: RFO-Request for Order (Initial); Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by Beach, Ruth. Action Type: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less