This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 12/15/2020 at 15:21:04 (UTC).

Russell Sigler Inc vs Berkshire Mechanical Inc., a Corporation et al.

Case Summary

On 06/03/2020 Russell Sigler Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Berkshire Mechanical Inc , a Corporation. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Guy Castillo, Erin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************4960

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Guy Castillo, Erin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Russell Sigler Inc

Defendants

Berkshire Mechanical Inc., a Corporation

Ulmer, Roger Dwain

 

Court Documents

SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $1,500 to $5,000 filed by Russell Sigler Inc. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $1,500 to $5,000; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

SC109 Authorization to Appear

Authorization to Appear filed by Russell Sigler Inc. Action Type: Authorization to Appear; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: Court Trial 2372.00 Principal, 50.00 Costs, set for 05/12/2021 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Erin Guy Castillo in Department 3A. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

SC104 Proof of Service (Small Claims)

Proof of Service (SC) as to Berkshire Mechanical Inc., a Corporation served on 07/08/2020 by Substituted Service. $60.00. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

SC104 Proof of Service (Small Claims)

Proof of Service (SC) as to Roger Dwain Ulmer served on 07/08/2020 by Substituted Service. $60.00. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Court Trial; Court Room: 3A; Judge: Erin Guy Castillo; Participant: Berkshire Mechanical Inc., a Corporation (Defendant); Participant: Roger Dwain Ulmer (Defendant); Participant: Russell Sigler Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • HearingHearing Type: Court Trial; Court Room: 3A; Result: Reset - Court's Motion; Judge: Erin Guy Castillo; Participant: Berkshire Mechanical Inc., a Corporation (Defendant); Participant: Roger Dwain Ulmer (Defendant); Participant: Russell Sigler Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service (SC) as to Roger Dwain Ulmer served on 07/08/2020 by Substituted Service. $60.00. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service (SC) as to Berkshire Mechanical Inc., a Corporation served on 07/08/2020 by Substituted Service. $60.00. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing regarding: Court Trial 2372.00 Principal, 50.00 Costs, set for 05/12/2021 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Erin Guy Castillo in Department 3A. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketHearing Result: Reset - Court's Motion Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketHearing regarding: Court Trial 2372.00 Principal, 50.00 Costs, set for 11/30/2020 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Erin Guy Castillo in Department 3A. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear filed by Russell Sigler Inc. Action Type: Authorization to Appear; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $1,500 to $5,000 filed by Russell Sigler Inc. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $1,500 to $5,000; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketPayment received by Russell Sigler Inc in the amount of $50.00. Receipt number 566590. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Russell Sigler Inc is a litigant