This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/06/2018 at 16:50:57 (UTC).

Rudy Gama vs. Jorge Leon

Case Summary

On 03/25/2010 Rudy Gama filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Jorge Leon. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Tracy Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************4862

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gama, Rudy

Defendant

Leon, Jorge

 

Court Documents

Payment Receipt

03/25/2010: Payment Receipt

SC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant

03/25/2010: SC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant

Minute Order

05/07/2010: Minute Order

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

05/17/2010: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Payment Receipt

06/22/2010: Payment Receipt

Minute Order

08/09/2010: Minute Order

Payment Receipt

08/20/2010: Payment Receipt

Payment Receipt

12/21/2010: Payment Receipt

Minute Order

01/03/2011: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2013
  • Docketlocation changed from Courthouse to Offsite,Records Management Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2012
  • DocketWrit of Execution Returned (writ partially satisfied, expired) filed by Gama, Rudy on 08/21/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2011
  • DocketDraft version of minutes printed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2011
  • DocketDraft version of minutes printed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2011
  • DocketDraft version of minutes printed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2011
  • DocketDraft version of minutes printed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2011
  • DocketMatter heard. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2011
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Claim of Exemption - Wage Garnishment (SC) heard 01/03/2011 08:30:00 AM. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2011
  • DocketClaim of exemption is denied. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2010
  • DocketScheduling auto case clock expired. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 03/25/2010
  • DocketAddress for Rudy Gama selected. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2010
  • DocketCase initiation form printed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2010
  • DocketCase initiation completed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2010
  • DocketCase has been initiated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2010
  • DocketVolume 1 created and added to case file with an ROA Start Date of 03/25/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2010
  • DocketPayment received for 03 - Claim $1,500 or less in the amount of 30.00 on 03/25/2010, transaction number 502926 and receipt number 118872. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2010
  • DocketAddress for Jorge Leon selected. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2010
  • DocketCourt Trial (SC) - Principal, 605.56 Costs, 30.00 scheduled for 05/07/2010 at 01:15:00 PM in T2 at Tracy. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2010
  • DocketCase assigned to Department T2. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2010
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Gama, Rudy on 03/25/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less