This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 12/20/2021 at 04:56:24 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs Ruben Orozco et al.

Case Summary

On 02/08/2019 The People of the State of California filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Ruben Orozco. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mulvihill, Michael. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1877

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mulvihill, Michael

 

Party Details

Petitioners

People of the State of California

The People of the State of California

Claimant

Orozco, Ruben

Respondent

Two Thousand Seven Hundred and Forty dollars

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Claimant Attorney

Somera, Gilbert D

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

MC200 Claim Opposing Forfeiture

Claim opposing forfeiture ($5,000 or less) filed by Orozco, Ruben. Action Type: Claim opposing forfeiture ($5,000 or less); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

CM015 Notice of Related Case

Notice of Related Case filed by Orozco, Ruben. Action Type: Notice of Related Case; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Orozco, Ruben. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Proof of Service

Proof of service filed by Orozco, Ruben. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Petition

Petition for Forfeiture filed by The People of the State of California. Action Type: Subsequent Petition; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Proof of Service

Proof of service filed by The People of the State of California. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by The People of the State of California. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Proof of Service

Proof of service filed by The People of the State of California. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Orozco, Ruben. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 05/09/2019 08:30 AM . Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Further Case Management Conference held on 08/15/2019 08:30 AM . Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

MinuteOrder.rtf

12/02/2019: MinuteOrder.rtf

Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail

Minutes finalized for Further Case Management Conference held on 12/02/2019 08:30 AM . Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Further Case Management Conference held on 12/02/2019 08:30 AM . Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2019
  • HearingHearing Type: Further Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10C; Result: Held; Judge: Michael Mulvihill; Participant: Ruben Orozco (Claimant); Participant: The People of the State of California (Petitioner); Participant: Two Thousand Seven Hundred and Forty dollars (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketEntry of Court Ordered Dismissal as to Ruben Orozco, The People of the State of California, Two Thousand Seven Hundred and Forty dollars Entered. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Further Case Management Conference held on 12/02/2019 08:30 AM . Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketHearing re: Further Case Management Conference held on December 2, 2019. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketHearing regarding: Further Case Management Conference , set for 12/02/2019 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Michael Mulvihill in Department 10C. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • HearingHearing Type: Further Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10C; Result: Held; Judge: Michael Mulvihill; Participant: Ruben Orozco (Claimant); Participant: The People of the State of California (Petitioner); Participant: Two Thousand Seven Hundred and Forty dollars (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Further Case Management Conference held on 08/15/2019 08:30 AM . Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketHearing re: Further Case Management Conference held on August 15, 2019. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • HearingHearing Type: Further Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10C; Result: Vacated; Judge: Michael Mulvihill; Participant: Ruben Orozco (Claimant); Participant: The People of the State of California (Petitioner); Participant: Two Thousand Seven Hundred and Forty dollars (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by The People of the State of California. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Forfeiture filed by The People of the State of California. Action Type: Subsequent Petition; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Related Case filed by Orozco, Ruben. Action Type: Notice of Related Case; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of service filed by Orozco, Ruben. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 05/09/2019 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Michael Mulvihill in Department 10C. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim opposing forfeiture ($5,000 or less) filed by Orozco, Ruben. Action Type: Claim opposing forfeiture ($5,000 or less); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Orozco, Ruben. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketAttorney, Gilbert D Somera, retained for Ruben Orozco . Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Somera, Gilbert D