This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/21/2018 at 02:01:38 (UTC).

Rose Welch vs Leon Wickett et al.

Case Summary

On 11/17/2015 Rose Welch filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Leon Wickett. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Manteca Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mulvihill, Michael. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0721

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mulvihill, Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Welch, Rose

Defendants

Wickett, Leon

Wickett, Kathy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rowe, Anthony Drew

 

Court Documents

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Welch, Rose. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Complaint

Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Welch, Rose. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons on First Amended Complaint issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Amended Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Welch, Rose. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Complaint

Amended Complaint filed by Welch, Rose. Changed property address. Action Type: Amended Complaint; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Rose Welch against Leon Wickett, Kathy Wickett filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default - Civil filed by Welch, Rose. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default as to all occupants - Civil filed by Welch, Rose. Entered. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of service as to all occupants filed by Welch, Rose. Date of Service 11/19/2015, fees $50.00. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Kathy Wickett served on 11/19/2015. Type of Service Personal. $ 50.00. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Leon Wickett served on 11/19/2015. Type of Service Personal. $ 50.00. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Application for Writ of Possession

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Welch, Rose. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Writ Return

Writ of Possession as to Leon Wickett returned. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/26/2016

DocketCase status updated to Disposed. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/08/2016

DocketWrit of Possession as to Kathy Wickett returned. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/08/2016
View Court Documents

DocketWrit of Possession as to Leon Wickett returned. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/08/2015

DocketWrit of Possession issued as to Kathy Wickett on 12/08/2015 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/08/2015

DocketWrit of Possession issued as to Leon Wickett on 12/08/2015 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/08/2015

DocketPayment received by in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 12913. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/08/2015
View Court Documents

DocketDeclaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Welch, Rose. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/04/2015
View Court Documents

DocketClerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Rose Welch against Leon Wickett, Kathy Wickett filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/04/2015

DocketRequest for Default against Leon Wickett, Kathy Wickett Entered Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/04/2015
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Entry of Default - Civil filed by Welch, Rose. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
11/19/2015
View Court Documents

DocketSummons on First Amended Complaint issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/19/2015
View Court Documents

DocketAmended Complaint filed by Welch, Rose. Changed property address. Action Type: Amended Complaint; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/19/2015
View Court Documents

DocketAmended Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Welch, Rose. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/17/2015

DocketPayment received by in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 8052. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/17/2015
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Welch, Rose. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/17/2015
View Court Documents

DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/17/2015
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Welch, Rose. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/17/2015

DocketAttorney, Anthony Drew Rowe, retained for Rose Welch . Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/17/2015
View Court Documents

DocketNotice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/17/2015

DocketCase initiated. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less