Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 04/06/2021 at 10:30:17 (UTC).

Ronald M Carlson et al. vs Vintage Aircraft, a California Corporation et al.

Case Summary

On 09/29/2020 Ronald M Carlson filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Vintage Aircraft, a California Corporation. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lee, Jayne and Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************8136

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lee, Jayne

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Carlson, Ronald M

Franzese, Kenneth

Defendants

Ramey, Taigh E.

Vintage Aircraft, a California Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cornwell, Stephen R

Defendant Attorney

Montanari, Garry L

 

Court Documents

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Carlson, Ronald M. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Lee, Jayne.

civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Carlson, Ronald M. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Demurrer held on 02/05/2021 09:00 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Notice of Entry of Order

Notice of Entry of Order filed by Carlson, Ronald M; Franzese, Kenneth. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Order; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Notice of Entry of Order

Notice of Entry of Order filed by Carlson, Ronald M; Franzese, Kenneth. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Order; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Order

Order Granting Application of Welson T. Chu to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice filed by Ronald M Carlson, Kenneth Franzese. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Order

Order Granting Application of Thomas P. Routh to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice filed by Ronald M Carlson, Kenneth Franzese. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Notice of Entry of Order

Notice of Entry of Order filed by Carlson, Ronald M; Franzese, Kenneth. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Order; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Proof of Service

Proof of service Re Applicant Thomas P. Routh's Notice of Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice and Supporting Documents filed by Carlson, Ronald M; Franzese, Kenneth. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

application

Verified Application of Welson T. Chu To Appear As Counsel Pro Hav Vice filed by Carlson, Ronald M. Action Type: Application - (Other); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Vintage Aircraft, a California Corporation served on 10/26/2020 by Personal Service. $90.00. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Taigh E. Ramey served on 10/26/2020 by Personal Service. $90.00. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail

Order on Notice of Related Cases. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 03/01/2021 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Order on Notice of Related Cases

Order on Notice of Related Cases. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

notice of related case

Notice of Related Case filed by Carlson, Ronald M. Action Type: Notice of Related Case; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10D; Judge: Barbara Kronlund; Participant: Kenneth Franzese (Plaintiff); Participant: Ronald M Carlson (Plaintiff); Participant: Taigh E. Ramey (Defendant); Participant: Vintage Aircraft, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Demurrer; Court Room: 10D; Judge: Barbara Kronlund; Participant: Kenneth Franzese (Plaintiff); Participant: Ronald M Carlson (Plaintiff); Participant: Taigh E. Ramey (Defendant); Participant: Vintage Aircraft, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10C; Result: Rescheduled; Judge: Jayne Lee; Participant: Ronald M Carlson (Plaintiff); Participant: Taigh E. Ramey (Defendant); Participant: Vintage Aircraft, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10D; Result: Continued-Court's Motion; Judge: Barbara Kronlund; Participant: Ronald M Carlson (Plaintiff); Participant: Taigh E. Ramey (Defendant); Participant: Vintage Aircraft, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Demurrer; Court Room: 10D; Result: Continued-Court's Motion; Judge: Barbara Kronlund; Participant: Taigh E. Ramey (Defendant); Participant: Vintage Aircraft, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled on 03/01/2021 at 8:45 AM has been Continued. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 05/28/2021 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Demurrer DEFTS Vintage Aircraft and Ramey's Demurrer to PLTF Carlson's Complaint, set for 05/28/2021 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketDemurrer DEFTS Vintage Aircraft and Ramey's Demurrer to PLTF Carlson's Complaint scheduled on 02/05/2021 at 9:00 AM has been Continued. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Demurrer held on 02/05/2021 09:00 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketHearing Result: Rescheduled Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Related Case filed by Carlson, Ronald M. Action Type: Notice of Related Case; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketAttorney, Stephen R Cornwell, retained for Ronald M Carlson . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 03/26/2021 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Carlson, Ronald M. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Carlson, Ronald M. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketPayment received by Ronald Carlson in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 588830. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Vintage Aircraft, a California Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cornwell, Stephen R