This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/27/2018 at 16:42:29 (UTC).

Ronald Crum vs. Sue Martin

Case Summary

On 10/31/2013 Ronald Crum filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Sue Martin. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mulvihill, Michael. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0996

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mulvihill, Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Crum, Ronald

Defendant

Martin, Sue

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

12/16/2013: Minute Order

Payment Receipt

01/07/2014: Payment Receipt

Notice that you have been sued

10/31/2013: Notice that you have been sued

Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

11/25/2013: Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

Payment Receipt

10/31/2013: Payment Receipt

 

Docket Entries

02/19/2014

Writ has been updated. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/19/2014

The status of Award2 has been updated to Fully Satisfied. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/19/2014

Writ of Possession Returned filed by Crum, Ronald on 02/04/2014. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/07/2014

Judgment by Court - After Trial associated on 01/07/2014. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/07/2014

Payment received for 141I - Writ in the amount of 25.00 on 01/07/2014, transaction number 1276087 and receipt number 338592. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/07/2014

Writ issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/07/2014

Application for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Crum, Ronald on 01/03/2014. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2014

Case security level updated to 1 effective . Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/28/2013

Milestone of Disposition 45 days met late. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/28/2013

Milestone of Disposition 30 days met late. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
44 More Docket Entries
10/31/2013

Cause of Action number 1 added. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2013

Case initiation form printed. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2013

Case has been initiated. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2013

Automatic UD Disposition Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2013

Automatic Failure to File Default Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2013

Automatic Proof of Service Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2013

Case assigned to Department M2. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2013

Original Summons filed by Crum, Ronald on 10/31/2013. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2013

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Crum, Ronald on 10/31/2013. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2013

Complaint filed by Crum, Ronald on 10/31/2013. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less