Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/30/2018 at 13:47:23 (UTC).

Ron Mariano vs. Alberto Solano Enriquez

Case Summary

On 05/02/2012 Ron Mariano filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Alberto Solano Enriquez. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mulvihill, Michael. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************5324

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mulvihill, Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mariano, Jane

Mariano, Ron

Defendant

Enriquez, Alberto Solano

 

Court Documents

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

06/06/2014: CIV110 Request for Dismissal

notice to court's order

06/02/2014: notice to court's order

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process)

05/30/2014: Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process)

Notice That You've Been Sued

05/03/2012: Notice That You've Been Sued

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

05/02/2012: SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

05/02/2012: CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

05/02/2012: Complaint

Notice that you have been sued

05/02/2012: Notice that you have been sued

Payment Receipt

05/02/2012: Payment Receipt

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2014
  • location changed from Courthouse to Offsite,Records Management Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2014
  • Milestone of Disposition 30 days met late. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2014
  • Milestone of Disposition 45 days met late. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • Complaint associated on 06/09/2014. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • Status of Alberto Enriquez updated to Dismissed without Prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • Status of Ron Mariano updated to Dismissed without Prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • Status of Jane Mariano updated to Dismissed without Prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • Motion - Other (CLM) - RE OSC scheduled for 08/14/2014 at 03:00:00 PM in M2 was vacated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 05/02/2012
  • Automatic Proof of Service Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2012
  • Address for Chad Wood selected. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2012
  • Cause of Action number 1 added. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2012
  • Case has been initiated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2012
  • Volume 1 created and added to case file with an ROA Start Date of 05/02/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2012
  • Summons issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2012
  • Case assigned to Department M2. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2012
  • Original Summons filed by Mariano, Ron; Mariano, Jane on 05/02/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2012
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Mariano, Ron; Mariano, Jane on 05/02/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2012
  • Complaint filed by Mariano, Ron; Mariano, Jane on 05/02/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less