This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/14/2018 at 20:50:23 (UTC).

Rohini Deo vs Nirmal Deo

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 Rohini Deo filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Nirmal Deo. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************3095

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Family Law Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Deo, Rohini

Respondent

Deo, Nirmal

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Lee, Christie S

Respondent Attorney

Coston, Corinne R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2018
  • Response and Request for Disso/Legal/Nulity (No Fee) filed by Deo, Nirmal. Action Type: Response and Request for Disso/Legal/Nulity (No Fee); Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • Hearing re: Request for Order-Initial held on January 18, 2018. Judge: McCann, Cheryl A..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • Minutes finalized for Request for Order-Initial held on 01/18/2018 08:15 AM . Judge: McCann, Cheryl A..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • Notice of Limited Scope Represenation filed by Deo, Rohini. Action Type: Notice of Limited Scope Represenation; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • Attorney, Christie S Lee, retained for Rohini Deo . Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Request for Order-Initial Resp's RFO to set aside default *TENTATIVE RULING*, set for 01/18/2018 at 8:15 AM before Hon. Cheryl A. McCann in Department 5A. Judge: McCann, Cheryl A..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • Proof of Service of Request for Order as to Rohini Deo served on 12/12/2017 by Personal Service. . Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • Attorney, Corrine R Coston, retained for Nirmal Deo . Judge: McCann, Cheryl A..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • Payment received by Nirmal Deo in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 240269. Judge: McCann, Cheryl A..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • Request for Default against Nirmal Deo Entered Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration filed by Deo, Rohini. Action Type: Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Nirmal Deo filed. Served on 06/14/2017. Method of Service: Personal Service Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Summons issued and filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Payment received by Rohini Deo in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 175560. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by Deo, Rohini. Action Type: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Case initiated. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Coston, Corinne R