This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 03/01/2022 at 03:50:34 (UTC).

Roger Reese vs Vibrantcare Outpatient Rehabilitation of California, Inc. et al.

Case Summary

On 12/19/2019 Roger Reese filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Vibrantcare Outpatient Rehabilitation of California, Inc. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************6976

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Reese, Roger

Defendants

Mackey, P.T., Corbin

Vibrant Outpatient Rehabilitation West, Inc.

Vibrantcare Rehabilitation, Inc.

Vibrant Health Services, Inc.

Vibrantcare Outpatient Rehabilitation of California, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fagundes, Joseph H

Defendant Attorneys

Marsh, Barry C

Robertson, Stephen W

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney filed by Reese, Roger.

Separate Statement

Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment or, In the Alternative, Summary Adjudication By Defendant Corbin Mackey, P.T. filed by Mackey, P.T., Corbin.

request for dismissal

09/24/2020: request for dismissal

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Mackey, P.T., Corbin.

Declaration

Declaration of Nicholas Colyvas, M.D. In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Mackey, P.T., Corbin.

Proof of Service

Proof of service filed by Mackey, P.T., Corbin.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion For Summary Judgment filed by Mackey, P.T., Corbin.

Notice of Entry of Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by Mackey, P.T., Corbin.

Judgment of Dismissal

Judgment for Corbin Mackey, P.T. against Roger Reese in the amount of 18480.00.

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: CMC: Further Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10D; Result: Vacated; Judge: Barbara Kronlund; Participants; Corbin Mackey, P.T. (Defendant); Roger Reese (Plaintiff); Vibrant Health Services, Inc. (Defendant); Vibrant Outpatient Rehabilitation West, Inc. (Defendant); Vibrantcare Outpatient Rehabilitation of California, Inc. (Defendant); Vibrantcare Rehabilitation, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment filed by Mackey, P.T., Corbin.; Action Type: Notice of Entry of Judgment; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketHearing Result: Vacated; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment for Corbin Mackey, P.T. against Roger Reese in the amount of 18480.00.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of service filed by Mackey, P.T., Corbin.; Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Lynda Vargem Re: Judgment Nunc Pro Tunc filed by Mackey, P.T., Corbin.; Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Jury Trial; Court Room: 10D; Result: Vacated; Judge: Barbara Kronlund; Participants; Corbin Mackey, P.T. (Defendant); Roger Reese (Plaintiff); Vibrant Health Services, Inc. (Defendant); Vibrant Outpatient Rehabilitation West, Inc. (Defendant); Vibrantcare Outpatient Rehabilitation of California, Inc. (Defendant); Vibrantcare Rehabilitation, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Court Room: 10D; Result: Vacated; Judge: Barbara Kronlund; Participants; Corbin Mackey, P.T. (Defendant); Roger Reese (Plaintiff); Vibrant Health Services, Inc. (Defendant); Vibrant Outpatient Rehabilitation West, Inc. (Defendant); Vibrantcare Outpatient Rehabilitation of California, Inc. (Defendant); Vibrantcare Rehabilitation, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs (Summary) filed by Mackey, P.T., Corbin.; Action Type: Memorandum of Costs (Summary); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
61 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint filed by Mackey, P.T., Corbin.; Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketPayment received by P.T., Mackey in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 526534.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 06/18/2020 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketPayment received by Roger Reese in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 513534.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney, Joseph H Fagundes, retained for Roger Reese .; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Reese, Roger.; Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Reese, Roger.; Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Vibrantcare Outpatient Rehabilitation of California, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Vibrantcare Rehabilitation, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fagundes, Joseph H