This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/17/2018 at 16:38:27 (UTC).

Roem Builders Incorporated vs Harkamal Singh

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 Roem Builders Incorporated filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Harkamal Singh. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************3151

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Roem Builders Incorporated

Defendant

Singh, Harkamal

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rothbard, Todd

 

Court Documents

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

UnlawfulDetainerNoticetoFilingParty.rtf

Unlawful Detainer Notice to Filing Party. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Roem Builders Incorporated. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Complaint

Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Roem Builders Incorporated. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Harkamal Singh served on 04/02/2017 by Personal Service. $65.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Harkamal Singh Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Declaration for Issuance of Writ of Possession pursuant to CCP 712.010

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Roem Builders Incorporated. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal Does filed by Roem Builders Incorporated. Action Type: Request for Dismissal Does; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Roem Builders Incorporated against Harkamal Singh filed and entered Judgment does not apply to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Writ Return

Writ of Possession as to Harkamal Singh served on 04/19/2017 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession as to Harkamal Singh served on 04/19/2017 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • DocketWrit of Possession issued as to Harkamal Singh on 04/11/2017 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Roem Builders Incorporated against Harkamal Singh filed and entered Judgment does not apply to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketPayment received by Todd Rothbard in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 158572. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Does filed by Roem Builders Incorporated. Action Type: Request for Dismissal Does; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Roem Builders Incorporated. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Default against Harkamal Singh Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Harkamal Singh served on 04/02/2017 by Personal Service. $65.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Roem Builders Incorporated. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketAttorney, Todd Rothbard, retained for Roem Builders Incorporated . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Notice to Filing Party. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketPayment received by Roem Builders Incorporated in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 155236. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Roem Builders Incorporated. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Roem Builders Incorporated. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Roem Builders, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rothbard, Todd B.