This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:39:28 (UTC).

Robin E. Skaggs vs Walter Barney et al.

Case Summary

On 02/23/2016 Robin E Skaggs filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Walter Barney. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ross, Roger. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1826

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ross, Roger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Skaggs, Robin E.

Defendants

Kinsel, Virgina

Barney, Walter

Skaggs, Timothy R.

Kinsel, Denise

Vera Barney Proctor and testate and interstate successors of Vera Barney Proctor

Kinsel, Darrel

Brown, Jacquline P.

Robinson, Rosie Lee

Robinson, Deborah A.

Vera Mae Kinsel and testate and interstate successors of Vera Mae Kinsel

Gordon, Mary Aline

Kinsel, William

Kinsel, Walter

Robinson, Oscar

Robinson, Ronald

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Marks, Craig S

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference To be heard at 9am to coincide with prove-up hearing, set for 08/16/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 13. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice to Filing Party

07/13/2016: Notice to Filing Party

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Jacquline P. Brown served on 02/26/2016 by Certified Mail. $0.00. Judge: Ross, Roger.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Walter Kinsel served on 02/26/2016 by Certified Mail. $0.00. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Proof of Publication

Proof of Publication filed by Skaggs, Robin E.. Action Type: Proof of Publication; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Order

Order for Publication of Summons filed by Robin E. Skaggs. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Declaration Re: Notice of Ex-Parte Application

Declaration regarding Notice of Ex Parte Application (no fee) filed by Skaggs, Robin E.. Action Type: Declaration regarding Notice of Ex Parte Application (no fee); Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Skaggs, Robin E.. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Skaggs, Robin E.. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Default Prove-up Hearing held on 08/16/2016 09:00 AM . Judge: Sueyres, F. Clark.

Judgment for Quiet Title

Judgment For Quiet Title entered and filed. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Request to Set

Request to Set Default or Uncontested Matter for Hearing filed by Skaggs, Robin E.. Action Type: Request to Set Default or Uncontested Matter for Hearing; Judge: Ross, Roger.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Ronald Robinson served on 02/26/2016 by Certified Mail. $0.00. Judge: Ross, Roger.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default - Civil filed by Skaggs, Robin E.. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Proof of Service

Proof of service by Posting (on Property) filed by Skaggs, Robin E.. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Application

Application/Request for Order Authorizing Service of Summons by Posting/Mailing or Publication filed by Skaggs, Robin E.. Action Type: Application/Request for Order Authorizing Service of Summons by Posting/Mailing or Publication; Judge: Ross, Roger.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Rosie Lee Robinson served on 03/07/2016. Type of Service Substituted service. $50.00. Judge: Ross, Roger.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment For Quiet Title entered and filed. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Sueyres, F. Clark.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Default Prove-up Hearing held on 08/16/2016 09:00 AM . Judge: Sueyres, F. Clark.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • Hearing re: Default Prove-up Hearing held on August 16, 2016. Judge: Sueyres, F. Clark.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 08/16/2016 09:00 AM . Judge: Sueyres, F. Clark.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • Hearing re: Case Management Conference held on August 16, 2016. Judge: Sueyres, F. Clark.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • Case Management Conference scheduled on 08/11/2016 at 8:30 AM has been Continued. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 08/11/2016 08:30 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference To be heard at 9am to coincide with prove-up hearing, set for 08/16/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 13. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Default Prove-up Hearing , set for 08/16/2016 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 13. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration regarding Notice of Ex Parte Application (no fee) filed by Skaggs, Robin E.. Action Type: Declaration regarding Notice of Ex Parte Application (no fee); Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 08/11/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 13. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 33883. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Skaggs, Robin E.. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Attorney, Craig S Marks, retained for Robin E. Skaggs . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Skaggs, Robin E.. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Ex Parte Application for Order for Publication of Summons filed by Skaggs, Robin E.. Action Type: Application for Order for Publication or Posting; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less