Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 22:25:16 (UTC).

Roberta T. Xique vs Irene Ojeda

Case Summary

On 11/01/2016 Roberta T Xique filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Irene Ojeda. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************1068

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Xique, Roberta T.

Defendant

Ojeda, Irene

 

Court Documents

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing Attachment Page

Order for Temporary Stay as to Irene Ojeda Denied and filed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Ex Parte Application for Temporary Stay of Execution of Unlawful Detainer Judgment

Ex Parte Application for Temporary Stay of Eviction filed by Ojeda, Irene. Action Type: Ex Parte Application for Temporary Stay of Eviction; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Order

Order for Temporary Stay as to Irene Ojeda Denied and filed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Declaration in Support of ExParte Application for Temporary Stay of Execution of Unlawful Detainer Judgment

Declaration in Support Ex Parte Application for Temporary Stay of Eviction filed by Ojeda, Irene. Action Type: Declaration in Support; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Amended Proof of Service filed by Xique, Roberta T.. Action Type: Amended; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Notice to Filing Party

Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Xique, Roberta T.. AS TO ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS ENTERED. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Irene Ojeda Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Xique, Roberta T.. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Writ Return

Writ of Possession as to Irene Ojeda served on 12/13/2016 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Order on ExParte Application for Temporary Stay of Execution of Unlawful Detainer Judgment

Order for Temporary Stay as to Irene Ojeda Denied and filed. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing Attachment Page

Order for Temporary Stay as to Irene Ojeda Denied and filed. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Roberta T. Xique against Irene Ojeda filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Xique, Roberta T.. AS TO ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS ENTERED. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing Attachment Page

Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Irene Ojeda. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

FW003 Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Irene Ojeda. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Irene Ojeda served on 11/03/2016 by Personal Service. $30.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession as to Irene Ojeda served on 12/13/2016 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order for Temporary Stay as to Irene Ojeda Denied and filed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application for Temporary Stay of Execution of Judgment filed by Ojeda, Irene. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Ex Parte Application for Temporary Stay of Eviction filed by Ojeda, Irene. Action Type: Ex Parte Application for Temporary Stay of Eviction; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order for Temporary Stay as to Irene Ojeda Denied and filed. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Ex Parte Application for Temporary Stay of Eviction filed by Ojeda, Irene. Action Type: Ex Parte Application for Temporary Stay of Eviction; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration in Support Ex Parte Application for Temporary Stay of Eviction filed by Ojeda, Irene. Action Type: Declaration in Support; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • Writ of Possession issued as to Irene Ojeda on 11/21/2016 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Roberta T. Xique against Irene Ojeda filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Default against Irene Ojeda Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default - Civil filed by Xique, Roberta T.. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Irene Ojeda served on 11/03/2016 by Personal Service. $30.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of service AS TO ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS filed by Xique, Roberta T.. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Xique, Roberta T.. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Xique, Roberta T.. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • Payment received by Roberta Xique in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 116221. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less