Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/20/2018 at 00:52:23 (UTC).

Robert Stone vs Juan Pablo Calderon

Case Summary

On 12/15/2016 Robert Stone filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Juan Pablo Calderon. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Holly, Carter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************2652

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Holly, Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stone, Robert

Defendant

Calderon, Juan Pablo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brelsford, William

Defendant Attorney

Polito, Dominic Martin

 

Court Documents

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 10/18/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Calderon, Juan Pablo. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Stone, Robert. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 06/16/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Calderon, Juan Pablo. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Calderon, Juan Pablo. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Stone, Robert. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial filed by Calderon, Juan Pablo. Action Type: Demand for Jury Trial; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Answer

Answer to Complaint (amount over $25,000) filed by Calderon, Juan Pablo. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Stone, Robert. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Stone, Robert. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Mandatory Settlement Conference , set for 08/20/2018 at 2:00 PM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 10B. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Jury Trial Assignment, set for 09/10/2018 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 10B. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 10/18/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Hearing re: CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on October 18, 2017. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Calderon, Juan Pablo. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Stone, Robert. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 10/18/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 10B. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 06/16/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • Hearing re: Case Management Conference held on June 16, 2017. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Calderon, Juan Pablo. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer to Complaint (amount over $25,000) filed by Calderon, Juan Pablo. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • Attorney, Dominic Martin Polito, retained for Juan Pablo Calderon . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 06/16/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 41. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • Attorney, William Brelsford, retained for Robert Stone . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Stone, Robert. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Stone, Robert. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • Payment received by Robert Stone in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 127081. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer POLITO, DOMINIC MARTIN