This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:39:44 (UTC).

Robert Rootsaert et al. vs Amy Rootsaert et al.

Case Summary

On 02/23/2016 Robert Rootsaert filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Amy Rootsaert. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************1829

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rootsaert, Robert

Rootsaert, Colleen

Defendants

Rootsaert, Kyle

Rootsaert, Amy

 

Court Documents

SC104 Proof of Service (Small Claims)

Proof of Service as to Amy Rootsaert (Substituted service). no fee Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Small Claims Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $5,000 to $10,000 filed by Rootsaert, Robert; Rootsaert, Colleen. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $5,000 to $10,000; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

SC100 Plaintiff's Claim Reset

Hearing regarding: Court Trial , set for 05/23/2016 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Sheryle Sparks in Department 17. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Ruling on Submitted Matter held on 06/20/2016 01:01 PM . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 05/23/2016 01:30 PM . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Ruling on Submitted Matter held on 06/20/2016 01:01 PM . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 06/20/2016 01:01 PM . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • Hearing re: Court Trial held on May 23, 2016. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 05/23/2016 01:30 PM . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service as to Amy Rootsaert (Substituted service). no fee Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: Court Trial , set for 05/23/2016 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Sheryle Sparks in Department 17. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • Hearing Result: Reset - Parties Motion Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Court Trial , set for 03/28/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Unassigned in Department J2. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • Payment received by the Law Offices of Steven A Clair in the amount of $75.00. Receipt number 33911. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $5,000 to $10,000 filed by Rootsaert, Robert; Rootsaert, Colleen. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $5,000 to $10,000; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less