This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/08/2018 at 09:56:34 (UTC).

Robert E. Barnett vs. Thomas Beauchamp

Case Summary

On 09/03/2010 Robert E Barnett filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Thomas Beauchamp. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Tracy Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************5029

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Barnett, Robert E.

Defendant

Beauchamp, Thomas

 

Court Documents

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process)

04/28/2011: Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

11/04/2010: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order

01/14/2011: Minute Order

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process)

04/28/2011: Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process)

Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

12/07/2010: Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

Payment Receipt

09/03/2010: Payment Receipt

Minute Order

10/18/2010: Minute Order

Judgment on Small Claims Appeal

03/04/2011: Judgment on Small Claims Appeal

Minute Order

11/01/2010: Minute Order

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2011
  • DocketExhibits destroyed Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2011
  • Docketlocation changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Small Claims to Other Court Location,Tracy,Other Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2011
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2011
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2011
  • DocketVolume updated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2011
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ruling on Submitted Matter heard 04/26/2011 04:02:00 PM. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2011
  • DocketThe motion is denied with prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2011
  • DocketMatter no longer under submission. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2011
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Motion - Other (CLM) heard 04/22/2011 10:00:00 AM. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2011
  • DocketMatter heard. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
83 More Docket Entries
  • 09/03/2010
  • DocketAddress for Thomas Beauchamp selected. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2010
  • DocketAddress for Robert Barnett selected. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2010
  • DocketCase initiation completed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2010
  • DocketCase has been initiated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2010
  • DocketVolume 1 created and added to case file with an ROA Start Date of 09/03/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2010
  • DocketAutomatic Small Claims Disposition Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2010
  • DocketCase initiation form printed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2010
  • DocketCourt Trial (SC) - Principal 5,500.00, Costs 75.00 scheduled for 10/18/2010 at 09:30:00 AM in T1 at Tracy. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2010
  • DocketCase assigned to Department T1. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2010
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Barnett, Robert E. on 09/03/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less