This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/18/2018 at 00:13:46 (UTC).

Robert Aranda, Carlos Saldana, on behalf of themselves and all "aggrieved employees" pursuant to Labor Code 2698 et seq. vs Universal Lumpers of California, Inc., a California corporation

Case Summary

On 07/26/2017 Robert Aranda, Carlos Saldana, on behalf of themselves and all aggrieved employees pursuant to Labor Code 2698 et seq filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Universal Lumpers of California, Inc , a California corporation. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ross, Roger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************7826

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ross, Roger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Aranda, Carlos Saldana, on behalf of themselves and all "aggrieved employees" pursuant to Labor Code 2698 et seq.

Defendant

Universal Lumpers of California, Inc., a California corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Katofsky, Alex Paul

Defendant Attorney

Morrison, Haley M.

 

Court Documents

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Robert Aranda, Carlos Saldana, on behalf of themselves and all 'aggrieved employees' pursuant to Labor Code 2698 et seq.. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Motion

Notice of Unopposed Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement and for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Robert Aranda, Carlos Saldana, on behalf of themselves and all 'aggrieved employees' pursuant to Labor Code 2698 et seq.. Action Type: Motion or other paper requesting a hearing; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Declaration of Service

Declaration of Service filed by Robert Aranda, Carlos Saldana, on behalf of themselves and all 'aggrieved employees' pursuant to Labor Code 2698 et seq.. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Stipulation

Stipulation & Order Continuing Case Management Conference And Other Pending Deadlines entered and filed. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice

Notice of Intent to Appear By Telephone filed by Robert Aranda, Carlos Saldana, on behalf of themselves and all 'aggrieved employees' pursuant to Labor Code 2698 et seq.. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Ross, Roger.

Order

Order filed by Universal Lumpers of California, Inc., a California corporation. Judge: Ross, Roger.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Universal Lumpers of California, Inc., a California corporation served on 08/01/2017 by Personal Service. $0.00. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Robert Aranda, Carlos Saldana, on behalf of themselves and all 'aggrieved employees' pursuant to Labor Code 2698 et seq.. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice

Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone filed by Robert Aranda, Carlos Saldana, on behalf of themselves and all 'aggrieved employees' pursuant to Labor Code 2698 et seq.. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing filed by Robert Aranda, Carlos Saldana, on behalf of themselves and all 'aggrieved employees' pursuant to Labor Code 2698 et seq.. Action Type: Notice of Hearing; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Declaration in Support

Declaration of Daniel F. Gaines in Support of Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement and for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Robert Aranda, Carlos Saldana, on behalf of themselves and all 'aggrieved employees' pursuant to Labor Code 2698 et seq.. Action Type: Declaration in Support; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Robert Aranda, Carlos Saldana, on behalf of themselves and all 'aggrieved employees' pursuant to Labor Code 2698 et seq.. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Robert Aranda, Carlos Saldana, on behalf of themselves and all 'aggrieved employees' pursuant to Labor Code 2698 et seq.. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

answer

Answer filed by Universal Lumpers of California, Inc., a California corporation. Action Type: Answer; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Stipulation and Order

Stipulation -First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000) filed by Universal Lumpers of California, Inc., a California corporation. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Robert Aranda, Carlos Saldana, on behalf of themselves and all 'aggrieved employees' pursuant to Labor Code 2698 et seq.. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Robert Aranda, Carlos Saldana, on behalf of themselves and all 'aggrieved employees' pursuant to Labor Code 2698 et seq.. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone filed by Robert Aranda, Carlos Saldana, on behalf of themselves and all 'aggrieved employees' pursuant to Labor Code 2698 et seq.. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing filed by Robert Aranda, Carlos Saldana, on behalf of themselves and all 'aggrieved employees' pursuant to Labor Code 2698 et seq.. Action Type: Notice of Hearing; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Service filed by Robert Aranda, Carlos Saldana, on behalf of themselves and all 'aggrieved employees' pursuant to Labor Code 2698 et seq.. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Daniel F. Gaines in Support of Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement and for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Robert Aranda, Carlos Saldana, on behalf of themselves and all 'aggrieved employees' pursuant to Labor Code 2698 et seq.. Action Type: Declaration in Support; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Unopposed Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement and for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Robert Aranda, Carlos Saldana, on behalf of themselves and all 'aggrieved employees' pursuant to Labor Code 2698 et seq.. Action Type: Motion or other paper requesting a hearing; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • Payment received by Carlos Robert Aranda in the amount of $60.00. Receipt number 305479. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • Hearing regarding: Motion Motion for Class Action Settlement and for Leave to File FAC, set for 07/24/2018 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 07/30/2018 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • Hearing Result: Continued - Parties Motion Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2017
  • Payment received by Inc., Universal Lumpers of California in the amount of $455.00. Receipt number 205124. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Universal Lumpers of California, Inc., a California corporation served on 08/01/2017 by Personal Service. $0.00. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 01/22/2018 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Attorney, Alex Paul Katofsky, retained for Robert Aranda, Carlos Saldana, on behalf of themselves and all 'aggrieved employees' pursuant to Labor Code 2698 et seq. . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Case initiated. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Robert Aranda, Carlos Saldana, on behalf of themselves and all 'aggrieved employees' pursuant to Labor Code 2698 et seq.. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Payment received by Carlos Robert Aranda in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 193529. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Robert Aranda, Carlos Saldana, on behalf of themselves and all 'aggrieved employees' pursuant to Labor Code 2698 et seq.. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MORRISON, HALEY M