This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 12:46:35 (UTC).

Rinaldo Macciola vs Kenny Juarez

Case Summary

On 07/30/2018 Rinaldo Macciola filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Kenny Juarez. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Manteca Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************9307

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Macciola, Rinaldo

Defendant

Juarez, Kenny

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Osgood, Warren

 

Court Documents

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

UnlawfulDetainerNoticetoFilingParty.rtf

Unlawful Detainer Notice to Filing Party. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Macciola, Rinaldo. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Complaint

Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Macciola, Rinaldo. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Proof of Service as to All Occupants

Proof of Service of summons as to all occupants in possession on 8-2-18 w/fees of $45.00 filed by Macciola, Rinaldo.Complies with CCP 415.46. Action Type: Proof of Personal Service; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service of Summons as to Kenny Juarez served on 08/02/2018 by Substituted Service. $55.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Declaration for Issuance of Writ of Possession pursuant to CCP 712.010

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Macciola, Rinaldo. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Kenny Juarez Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Rinaldo Macciola against Kenny Juarez filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Writ Return

Writ of Possession as to Kenny Juarez served on 09/05/2018 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2019
  • Case status updated to Closed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession as to Kenny Juarez served on 09/05/2018 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • Writ of Possession issued as to Kenny Juarez on 08/20/2018 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • Payment received by Law Office of Warren Osgood in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 326904. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Rinaldo Macciola against Kenny Juarez filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Default against Kenny Juarez Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Macciola, Rinaldo. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Macciola, Rinaldo. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of summons as to all occupants in possession on 8-2-18 w/fees of $45.00 filed by Macciola, Rinaldo.Complies with CCP 415.46. Action Type: Proof of Personal Service; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Kenny Juarez served on 08/02/2018 by Substituted Service. $55.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • Attorney, Warren Osgood, retained for Rinaldo Macciola . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Macciola, Rinaldo. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Macciola, Rinaldo. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Unlawful Detainer Notice to Filing Party. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • Case initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • Payment received by Warren Osgood in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 319033. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less