This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 03/04/2020 at 06:53:29 (UTC).

Rick Stuyt et al. vs Victor Picazo

Case Summary

On 08/08/2019 Rick Stuyt filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Victor Picazo. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Manteca Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Holly, Carter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0282

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Holly, Carter

 

Court Documents

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 11/20/2019 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 10B. Judge: Holly, Carter.

Amended MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 09/27/2019 11:00 AM . Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

Notice of Reassignment of Judicial Officer

Carter Holly Assigned. Judge: Holly, Carter.

Declaration for Issuance of Writ of Possession pursuant to CCP 712.010

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Stuyt, Anastasia; Stuyt, Rick. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Rick Stuyt, Anastasia Stuyt, Victor Picazo, All Other Occupants Entered. Judge: Holly, Carter.

UD150 Request/Counter-Request to Set Case

Request to Set/Counter Request to Set for Trial filed by Stuyt, Rick; Stuyt, Anastasia. Action Type: Request to Set/Counter Request to Set for Trial; Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

UD105 Answer

First paper Limited Civil (amounts up to $10,000) filed by Picazo, Victor. Action Type: First paper Limited Civil (amounts up to $10,000); Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/30/2019

DocketCase status updated to Disposed. Judge: Holly, Carter.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2019

DocketHearing Result: Vacated~Dismissal Filed Judge: Holly, Carter.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2019

DocketRequest for Dismissal filed by Stuyt, Anastasia; Stuyt, Rick. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2019
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Rick Stuyt, Anastasia Stuyt, Victor Picazo, All Other Occupants Entered. Judge: Holly, Carter.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/01/2019
View Court Documents

DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 11/20/2019 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 10B. Judge: Holly, Carter.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/01/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCarter Holly Assigned. Judge: Holly, Carter.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2019
View Court Documents

DocketMinutes finalized for Court Trial held on 09/27/2019 11:00 AM . Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2019
View Court Documents

DocketMinutes finalized for Court Trial held on 09/27/2019 11:00 AM . Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2019

DocketHearing re: Court Trial held on September 27, 2019. Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2019
View Court Documents

DocketHearing regarding: Court Trial , set for 09/27/2019 at 11:00 AM before Hon. Jonathan W. Fattarsi in Department M2. Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
08/14/2019

DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Picazo, Victor. Action Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2019

DocketAttorney, Anthony Drew Rowe, retained for Anastasia Stuyt . Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2019

DocketAttorney, Anthony Drew Rowe, retained for Rick Stuyt . Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2019
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Stuyt, Anastasia; Stuyt, Rick. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Stuyt, Anastasia; Stuyt, Rick. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2019

DocketPayment received by ROWE in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 456066. Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2019
View Court Documents

DocketUnlawful Detainer Notice to Filing Party. Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2019
View Court Documents

DocketNotice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2019

DocketCase initiated. Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

[+] Read More [-] Read Less