This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 06:24:37 (UTC).

Renay Cano vs ABM Onsite Services-West Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/02/2016 Renay Cano filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ABM Onsite Services-West Inc. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lofthus, Linda L. and Scott, W. Stephen. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1047

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lofthus, Linda L.

Scott, W. Stephen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cano, Reyna

Cano, Renay

Defendant

ABM Onsite Services-West Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alam, Jesmin L

Alam, Jesmin

Defendant Attorney

Wersching, Eric J.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: CMC: Request for Dismissal , set for 08/27/2018 at 8:30 AM before Hon. W. Stephen Scott in Department 10A. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

Notice of Settlement

Notice of Settlement - Conditional filed by Cano, Renay. Action Type: Notice of Settlement - Conditional; Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Trial Setting Conference held on 03/13/2018 08:30 AM . Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

Notice of Reassignment of Judicial Officer

W. Stephen Scott Assigned. BATCH Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 09/12/2017 08:30 AM . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Cano, Renay. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Cano, Renay. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 05/15/2017 08:30 AM . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by ABM Onsite Services-West Inc.. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Proof of Service/ Publication held on 12/05/2016 08:30 AM . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Answer

Defendant ABM Onsite Services West, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by ABM Onsite Services-West Inc.. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 10/11/2016 08:30 AM . Judge: Sueyres, F. Clark.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 08/09/2016 08:30 AM . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cano, Reyna. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Cano, Reyna. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2018
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Request for Dismissal , set for 05/16/2018 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • Case status updated to Conditional Settlement. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Request for Dismissal , set for 08/27/2018 at 8:30 AM before Hon. W. Stephen Scott in Department 10A. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Settlement - Conditional filed by Cano, Renay. Action Type: Notice of Settlement - Conditional; Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • Hearing re: Trial Setting Conference held on March 13, 2018. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Trial Setting Conference held on 03/13/2018 08:30 AM . Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Request for Dismissal , set for 05/16/2018 at 8:30 AM before Hon. W. Stephen Scott in Department 10A. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • W. Stephen Scott Assigned. BATCH Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • Hearing Result: Reassigned Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 02/02/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 08/09/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Linda L. Lofthus in Department 11. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 08/02/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Linda L. Lofthus in Department 11. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cano, Reyna. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Cano, Reyna. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 28120. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • Attorney, Jesmin L Alam, retained for Reyna Cano . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less