This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 05/29/2023 at 05:22:07 (UTC).

Regina Grogan vs Care Living Centers, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 Regina Grogan filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Care Living Centers, LLC. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Waters, Robert T.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1689

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Waters, Robert T.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Donald Scott, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott

Jovan Grogan, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott

Regina Grogan, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott

*Donald Scott, individually and as Successor-in-Interest to Decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott

*Jovan Grogan individually and as Successor-in-Interest to Decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott

*Regina Grogan individually and as Successor-In-Interest to Decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott

Defendants

Citrus Gardens Senior Living, LLC

A&A Senior Living Management, a California limited liability corporation

Care Living Centers, LLC, a Nevada limited liability corporation, dba Rose Place Memory Care

Villa Marche Stockton Leasing, LLC

*A&A Senior Living Management, a California Limited Liability Corporation

*Care Living Centers, LLC, a Nevada Limited Liability Corporation, dba Rose Place Memory Care

*GT Madison Realty, LLC

*GTM U.S. Senior Housing Reit, Inc.

*GTM U.S. Senior Housing Reit, LP

*Madison Realty Equities, LLC

*Villa Marche Stockton Leasing, LLC

*Villa Marche Stockton Senior Living, LP

*Villla Marche Senior Partners, LLC

Dominici, Betty (Doe 4)

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fowler, Jason P

Defendant Attorneys

Baleria, Paul R

Zenere, James J

 

Court Documents

Amended Answer

Defendant A&A Senior Living Management, LLC's Amended Answer to Complaint for Damages filed by *A&A Senior Living Management, a California Limited Liability Corporation.

pos010-Proof of Service

Proof of Service of Summons as to *Villa Marche Stockton Leasing, LLC served on 07/27/2022 by Personal Service. $71.00.

pos010-Proof of Service

Proof of Service of Summons as to *GT Madison Realty, LLC served on 07/27/2022 by Personal Service. $15.00.

pos010-Proof of Service

Proof of Service of Summons as to *GTM U.S. Senior Housing Reit, Inc. served on 09/08/2022 by Personal Service. $150.00.

Answer

Defendant A&A Senior Living Management, LLC's Answer to Complaint for Damages filed by *A&A Senior Living Management, a California Limited Liability Corporation.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to *Madison Realty Equities, LLC served on 07/28/2022 by Substituted Service. $71.00.

Proof of Service

Proof of service by Notice of and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Civil filed by *Donald Scott, individually and as Successor-in-Interest to Decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott.

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 08/10/2022 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Robert T. Waters in Department 11B.

Order

Order Granting Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to Deem Cases Related and Consolidated signed by Judge Waters filed by Regina Grogan, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott, Jovan Grogan, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to West Bay Senior Living (Doe 2) served on 05/12/2023 by Substituted Service. $71.00.

Amendment to Complaint

Amendment to Complaint (Does 7) filed by Regina Grogan, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott; Donald Scott, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott; Jovan Grogan, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott.

Amendment to Complaint

Amendment to Complaint (Does 6) filed by Regina Grogan, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott; Donald Scott, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott; Jovan Grogan, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott.

Amendment to Complaint

Amendment to Complaint (Does 5) filed by Regina Grogan, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott; Donald Scott, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott; Jovan Grogan, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott.

Amendment to Complaint

Amendment to Complaint (Does 4) filed by Regina Grogan, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott; Donald Scott, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott; Jovan Grogan, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott.

Amendment to Complaint

Amendment to Complaint (Does 3) filed by Regina Grogan, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott; Donald Scott, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott; Jovan Grogan, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott.

Amendment to Complaint

Amendment to Complaint (Does 2) filed by Regina Grogan, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott; Donald Scott, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott; Jovan Grogan, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott.

Amendment to Complaint

Amendment to Complaint (Doe 1) filed by Regina Grogan, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott; Donald Scott, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott; Jovan Grogan, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott.

Notice to Filing Party

04/17/2023: Notice to Filing Party

94 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Jury Trial; Court Room: 11B; Judge: Robert T. Waters; Participants; *A&A Senior Living Management, a California Limited Liability Corporation (Defendant); *Care Living Centers, LLC, a Nevada Limited Liability Corporation, dba Rose Place Memory Care (Defendant); *Donald Scott, individually and as Successor-in-Interest to Decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott (Plaintiff); *GT Madison Realty, LLC (Defendant); *GTM U.S. Senior Housing Reit, Inc. (Defendant); *GTM U.S. Senior Housing Reit, LP (Defendant); *Jovan Grogan individually and as Successor-in-Interest to Decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott (Plaintiff); *Madison Realty Equities, LLC (Defendant); *Regina Grogan individually and as Successor-In-Interest to Decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott (Plaintiff); *Villa Marche Stockton Leasing, LLC (Defendant); *Villa Marche Stockton Senior Living, LP (Defendant); *Villla Marche Senior Partners, LLC (Defendant); A&A Senior Living Management, a California limited liability corporation (Defendant); Care Living Centers, LLC, a Nevada limited liability corporation, dba Rose Place Memory Care (Defendant); Citrus Gardens Senior Living, LLC (Defendant); Donald Scott, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott (Plaintiff); Jovan Grogan, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott (Plaintiff); Regina Grogan, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott (Plaintiff); Villa Marche Stockton Leasing, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Court Room: 11B; Judge: Robert T. Waters; Participants; *A&A Senior Living Management, a California Limited Liability Corporation (Defendant); *Care Living Centers, LLC, a Nevada Limited Liability Corporation, dba Rose Place Memory Care (Defendant); *Donald Scott, individually and as Successor-in-Interest to Decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott (Plaintiff); *GT Madison Realty, LLC (Defendant); *GTM U.S. Senior Housing Reit, Inc. (Defendant); *GTM U.S. Senior Housing Reit, LP (Defendant); *Jovan Grogan individually and as Successor-in-Interest to Decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott (Plaintiff); *Madison Realty Equities, LLC (Defendant); *Regina Grogan individually and as Successor-In-Interest to Decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott (Plaintiff); *Villa Marche Stockton Leasing, LLC (Defendant); *Villa Marche Stockton Senior Living, LP (Defendant); *Villla Marche Senior Partners, LLC (Defendant); A&A Senior Living Management, a California limited liability corporation (Defendant); Care Living Centers, LLC, a Nevada limited liability corporation, dba Rose Place Memory Care (Defendant); Citrus Gardens Senior Living, LLC (Defendant); Donald Scott, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott (Plaintiff); Jovan Grogan, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott (Plaintiff); Regina Grogan, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott (Plaintiff); Villa Marche Stockton Leasing, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to West Bay Senior Living (Doe 2) served on 05/12/2023 by Substituted Service. $71.00.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Does 7) filed by Regina Grogan, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott; Donald Scott, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott; Jovan Grogan, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Does 6) filed by Regina Grogan, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott; Donald Scott, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott; Jovan Grogan, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Does 5) filed by Regina Grogan, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott; Donald Scott, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott; Jovan Grogan, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Does 4) filed by Regina Grogan, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott; Donald Scott, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott; Jovan Grogan, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Does 3) filed by Regina Grogan, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott; Donald Scott, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott; Jovan Grogan, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Does 2) filed by Regina Grogan, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott; Donald Scott, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott; Jovan Grogan, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Doe 1) filed by Regina Grogan, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott; Donald Scott, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott; Jovan Grogan, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
141 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 08/26/2021 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Robert T. Waters in Department 11B.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Jovan Grogan, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott; Donald Scott, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott; Regina Grogan, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Jovan Grogan, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott; Donald Scott, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott; Regina Grogan, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Jason P Fowler, retained for Donald Scott, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott .; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Jason P Fowler, retained for Jovan Grogan, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott .; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Jason P Fowler, retained for Regina Grogan, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Evelyn Alyne Scott .; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketPayment received by individually Regina Grogan in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 624930.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less