This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 05/14/2023 at 14:08:25 (UTC).

Red Target, LLC dba SCJ Commercial Financial Services vs Hong Duy Vuong et al.

Case Summary

On 01/09/2023 Red Target, LLC dba SCJ Commercial Financial Services filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Hong Duy Vuong. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Waters, Robert T.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0126

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Waters, Robert T.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Red Target, LLC dba SCJ Commercial Financial Services

Defendants

Huynh, Thu Yen

Vuong, Hong Duy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Melhouse, Christina

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Red Target, LLC dba SCJ Commercial Financial Services.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Red Target, LLC dba SCJ Commercial Financial Services.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Hong Duy Vuong served on 01/19/2023 by Substituted Service. $75.00.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Thu Yen Huynh served on 01/18/2023 by Personal Service. $10.00.

Notice of Reassignment of Judicial Officer (RW)

Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 07/10/2023 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Robert T. Waters in Department 11B.

 

Docket Entries

07/10/2023

HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10A; Result: Reassigned; Judge: George J. Abdallah; Participants; Hong Duy Vuong (Defendant); Red Target, LLC dba SCJ Commercial Financial Services (Plaintiff); Thu Yen Huynh (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2023

HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 11B; Judge: Robert T. Waters; Participants; Hong Duy Vuong (Defendant); Red Target, LLC dba SCJ Commercial Financial Services (Plaintiff); Thu Yen Huynh (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2023

DocketHearing Result: Reassigned; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 07/10/2023 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Robert T. Waters in Department 11B.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Thu Yen Huynh served on 01/18/2023 by Personal Service. $10.00.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Hong Duy Vuong served on 01/19/2023 by Substituted Service. $75.00.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 07/10/2023 at 8:45 AM before Hon. George J. Abdallah in Department 10A.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Red Target, LLC dba SCJ Commercial Financial Services.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Red Target, LLC dba SCJ Commercial Financial Services.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketPayment received by LLC Red Target in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 802159.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketAttorney, Christina Melhouse, retained for Red Target, LLC dba SCJ Commercial Financial Services .; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less