This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 11/05/2022 at 02:39:06 (UTC).

Rebecca Swan et al. vs Derrick Wilburn

Case Summary

On 11/02/2021 Rebecca Swan filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Derrick Wilburn. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Guy Castillo, Erin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0235

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Guy Castillo, Erin

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Swan, Rebecca.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Swan, Rebecca.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

Notice

Notice of Lien filed by National Express Transit Corp..

CM020 Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleadings

Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleadings and Orders filed by Rebecca Swan.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Derrick Wilburn served on 01/04/2022 by Substituted Service. $591.00.

Notice to Filing Party

02/16/2022: Notice to Filing Party

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by National Express Transit Corp..

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Rebecca Swan, Derrick Wilburn, National Express Transit Corp. Entered.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Swan, Rebecca.

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal with prejudice, each side to bear their own costs and fees filed by Swan, Rebecca.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10B; Result: Vacated; Judge: Erin Guy Castillo; Participants; Derrick Wilburn (Defendant); Rebecca Swan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketHearing Result: Vacated; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Rebecca Swan, Derrick Wilburn, National Express Transit Corp. Entered.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with prejudice, each side to bear their own costs and fees filed by Swan, Rebecca.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Swan, Rebecca.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by National Express Transit Corp..; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketPayment received by Rebecca Swan in the amount of $150.00. Receipt number 717460.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Derrick Wilburn served on 01/04/2022 by Substituted Service. $591.00.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleadings and Orders filed by Rebecca Swan.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Lien filed by National Express Transit Corp..; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketPayment received by National Express Transit Corp. in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 708173.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 05/03/2022 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Erin Guy Castillo in Department 10B.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Swan, Rebecca.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Ibraham Dbouk, retained for Rebecca Swan .; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Swan, Rebecca.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Rebecca Swan in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 693511.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less