This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 12/07/2023 at 05:09:15 (UTC).

Rayven Alexandrea Snyder vs Anthony Breon Snyder

Case Summary

On 01/09/2023 Rayven Alexandrea Snyder filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Anthony Breon Snyder. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Appel, Robin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0103

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Appel, Robin

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Snyder, Rayven Alexandrea

Respondent

Snyder, Anthony Breon

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

11/20/2023

HearingHearing Type: Default Dissolution; Court Room: 5A; Result: Held; Judge: Cheryl A. McCann; Participants; Rayven Alexandrea Snyder (Petitioner)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/20/2023

DocketHearing re: Default Dissolution held on November 20, 2023.; Judge: McCann, Cheryl A.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/20/2023

DocketMinutes finalized for Default Dissolution held on 11/20/2023 10:30 AM .; Judge: McCann, Cheryl A.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2023

DocketHearing regarding: Default Dissolution Default Disso, set for 11/20/2023 at 10:30 AM before Hon. Cheryl A. McCann in Department 5A.; Judge: McCann, Cheryl A.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2023

DocketRequest to Set Default or Uncontested Matter for Hearing filed by Snyder, Rayven Alexandrea.; Judge: Appel, Robin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023

DocketRequest to Enter Default - Family Law filed by Snyder, Rayven Alexandrea.; Judge: Appel, Robin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023

DocketDeclaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration filed by Snyder, Rayven Alexandrea.; Judge: Appel, Robin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023

DocketRequest for Default against Anthony Breon Snyder Entered; Judge: Appel, Robin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023

DocketProof of Service of FL-160 Community Property Declaration and FL-160 Separate Property Declaration as to Anthony Breon Snyder served on 07/14/2023 by Personal Service. .; Judge: Appel, Robin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023

DocketProof of Service of F-150, FL-141, FL-140 as to Anthony Breon Snyder served on 02/23/2023 by Mailing. .; Judge: Appel, Robin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
04/04/2023

DocketCommunity and Quasi Community Property Declaration filed by Snyder, Rayven Alexandrea.; Judge: Appel, Robin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2023

DocketIncome and Expense Declaration filed by Snyder, Rayven Alexandrea.; Judge: Appel, Robin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Anthony Breon Snyder filed. Served on 01/09/2023. Method of Service: Personal Service; Judge: Appel, Robin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Appel, Robin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketPayment received in the amount of $435.00, receipt number 802198.; Judge: Appel, Robin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketAssessed $435.00 Civil Costs on Petitioner, Snyder, Rayven Alexandrea; Judge: Appel, Robin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Snyder, Rayven Alexandrea.; Judge: Appel, Robin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by Snyder, Rayven Alexandrea.; Judge: Appel, Robin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketDeclaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act (UCCJEA) filed by .; Judge: Appel, Robin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Appel, Robin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less