This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 06:08:05 (UTC).

Raymond Cost et al. vs John Kohler et al.

Case Summary

On 01/29/2016 Raymond Cost filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against John Kohler. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Manteca Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mulvihill, Michael. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0895

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mulvihill, Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cost, Raymond

Costa, Lucia

Defendants

Kohler, Theresa

Kohler, John

 

Court Documents

Writ Return

Writ of Possession as to John Kohler and Theresa Kohler Writ returned satisfied with Costs $145.00 Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail

Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Order Striking Answer

Order Striking Answer filed by Theresa Kohler on 03/01/2016 signed by Judge Mulvihill. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Application for Writ of Possession

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Cost, Raymond; Costa, Lucia. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

FW003 Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Theresa Kohler filed. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

POS020 Proof of Personal Service

Proof of service as to John Kohler filed by Costa, Lucia; Cost, Raymond. Invalid, wrong form filed. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

POS020 Proof of Personal Service

Proof of service as to Theresa Kohler filed by Costa, Lucia; Cost, Raymond. Invalid, wrong form filed. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Costa, Lucia; Cost, Raymond. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Raymond Cost, Lucia Costa against John Kohler, Theresa Kohler filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Cost, Raymond; Costa, Lucia. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Theresa Kohler served on 02/02/2016. Type of Service Personal. $0.00. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of service as to all occupants filed by Costa, Lucia; Cost, Raymond. Service date 02/02/2016, fees $25.00. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

UD105 Answer

First paper Limited Civil (amounts up to $10,000) filed by Kohler, Theresa. With attached proof of service. Action Type: First paper Limited Civil (amounts up to $10,000); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

FW001 Request to Waive Court Fees

Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Kohler, Theresa. Action Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

POS020 Proof of Personal Service

Proof of service as to all occupants filed by Cost, Raymond; Costa, Lucia. Invalid, wrong form filed. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Complaint

Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer ($10,000 up to $25,000) filed by Costa, Lucia; Cost, Raymond. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer ($10,000 up to $25,000); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession as to John Kohler and Theresa Kohler Writ returned satisfied with Costs $145.00 Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • Writ of Possession issued as to Theresa Kohler on 03/03/2016 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • Writ of Possession issued as to John Kohler on 03/03/2016 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 36960. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Striking Answer filed by Theresa Kohler on 03/01/2016 signed by Judge Mulvihill. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Raymond Cost, Lucia Costa against John Kohler, Theresa Kohler filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • First paper Limited Civil (amounts up to $10,000) filed by Kohler, Theresa. With attached proof of service. Action Type: First paper Limited Civil (amounts up to $10,000); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Theresa Kohler filed. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Theresa Kohler served on 02/02/2016. Type of Service Personal. $0.00. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of service as to all occupants filed by Cost, Raymond; Costa, Lucia. Invalid, wrong form filed. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of service as to John Kohler filed by Costa, Lucia; Cost, Raymond. Invalid, wrong form filed. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of service as to Theresa Kohler filed by Costa, Lucia; Cost, Raymond. Invalid, wrong form filed. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $385.00. Receipt number 26857. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer ($10,000 up to $25,000) filed by Costa, Lucia; Cost, Raymond. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer ($10,000 up to $25,000); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Costa, Lucia; Cost, Raymond. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less