This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 08:04:27 (UTC).

Ray Klein, Inc., dba Professional Credit Service vs Kyle Zeman

Case Summary

On 02/23/2016 Ray Klein, Inc , dba Professional Credit Service filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Kyle Zeman. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************2106

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ray Klein, Inc., dba Professional Credit Service

Ray Klein, Inc.,

Defendant

Zeman, Kyle

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Salsbury, Megan E.

Horsfall, Hannah R

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint Limited - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit filed by Ray Klein, Inc., dba Professional Credit Service. Action Type: Complaint Limited - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

MC050 Substitution of Attorney Civil (Without Court Order)

Substitution of Attorney filed by Ray Klein, Inc.,. Duplicate Filing Action Type: Substitution of Attorney; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ray Klein, Inc., dba Professional Credit Service. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Due Diligence Declaration

Declaration of Due Diligence filed by Ray Klein, Inc., dba Professional Credit Service. Action Type: Declaration of Due Diligence; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Plaintiff's Notice of Unavailability

Plaintiff's Notice of unavailability - (Other) filed by Ray Klein, Inc., dba Professional Credit Service. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CIV120 Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service filed by Ray Klein, Inc.,. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Ray Klein, Inc.,, Kyle Zeman Entered. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Ray Klein, Inc.,. (DUPLICATE FILING. PREVIOUSLY DISMISSED ON 1/3/17) Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fee Pursuant to BP 6322.1

Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fee Pursuant to BP 6322.1c1 filed by Ray Klein, Inc., dba Professional Credit Service. Action Type: Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fee Pursuant to BP 6322.1c1; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

MC050 Substitution of Attorney Civil (Without Court Order)

Substitution of Attorney filed by Ray Klein, Inc.,. Action Type: Substitution of Attorney; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

NoticeofCaseAssignment-WithoutHearing.rtf

Notice of Case Assignment. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service filed by Ray Klein, Inc.,. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Ray Klein, Inc.,. (DUPLICATE FILING. PREVIOUSLY DISMISSED ON 1/3/17) Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Substitution of Attorney filed by Ray Klein, Inc.,. Duplicate Filing Action Type: Substitution of Attorney; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Ray Klein, Inc.,, Kyle Zeman Entered. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Ray Klein, Inc.,. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Substitution of Attorney filed by Ray Klein, Inc.,. Action Type: Substitution of Attorney; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • Attorney, Hannah R Horsfall, retained for Ray Klein, Inc., . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Due Diligence filed by Ray Klein, Inc., dba Professional Credit Service. Action Type: Declaration of Due Diligence; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Notice of unavailability - (Other) filed by Ray Klein, Inc., dba Professional Credit Service. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ray Klein, Inc., dba Professional Credit Service. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit filed by Ray Klein, Inc., dba Professional Credit Service. Action Type: Complaint Limited - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Payment received by Professional Credit Service in the amount of $181.00. Receipt number 36105. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fee Pursuant to BP 6322.1c1 filed by Ray Klein, Inc., dba Professional Credit Service. Action Type: Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fee Pursuant to BP 6322.1c1; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Attorney, Megan E. Salsbury, retained for Ray Klein, Inc., dba Professional Credit Service . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less