This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 11/24/2019 at 01:07:17 (UTC).

Randall G Strange vs. Anderson Homes

Case Summary

On 10/10/2013 Randall G Strange filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Anderson Homes. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Holly, Carter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0263

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Holly, Carter

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Ching, Catharine Ann

Rapp, Susan H.

Rangel, Joann Marie O'Hara

Cohen, Adrienne Dee

Ramia, Sean Anthony

Basset, Robert D

Hammons, Wallace William

Nordstrom, Adrienne E.

Brown, Gregory H.

Hernandez, Julio Antonio

Foutz, Alan Wayne

Cano, Gino

Lowe, Amanda R

Marcott, Jacquelene A.

 

Court Documents

TentativeRuling/ProbateNote.rtf

Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Holly, Carter.

Order

Order Granting Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement entered as to Anthony Tile Inc A California Corporation. Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice of Entry of Order

Notice of Entry of Order filed by Anderson Homes, a California corporation. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Order; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Payment Receipt

04/02/2015: Payment Receipt

Proof of Service

Proof of service filed by The Northern Insurance Company Of New York As Intervenor In Its Capacity As An Insurer Of Bdl Painting Inc. A Suspended Corporation. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice

Notice of Further case Management Conference filed by Strange, Randall G; Strange, Donna M. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Strange, Randall G; Strange, Donna M. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Proof of Service

Proof of service filed by Anderson Homes. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Holly, Carter.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Ragsdale S Heat And Air Inc A California Corporation Entered Judge: Holly, Carter.

165 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2019
  • DocketCase status updated to Closed. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • DocketHearing Result: Vacated Judge: Holly, Carter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal - Entire Action as to American Specialty Lines Insurance Company on behalf of its insured Atmos Corporation dba Merzon Industries, a forfeited foreign corporation Entered. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Atmos Corporation. As to Complaint in Interventioon Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Christina Kurtz in Response to OSC Re: Settlement Compliance filed by Strange, Donna M; Strange, Randall G. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Atmos Corporation. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Javier Corona, Glass Tech, Inc., Atmos Corporation Entered. As to the Cross-Complaint filed by Atmos Corporation Judge: Holly, Carter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Financial Pacific Insurance Company Entered. As to Complaint in Intervention filed by Intervenor Financial Pacific Insurance Company Judge: Holly, Carter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Moes 1-100, Valley Distributors, Inc. Entered. As to Cross-Complaint filed by Valley Distributors, Inc. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
902 More Docket Entries
  • 10/10/2013
  • DocketCase initiation completed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2013
  • DocketAutomatic Failure to File Default Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2013
  • DocketAutomatic Proof of Service Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2013
  • DocketAutomatic Unlimited Case Disposition Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2013
  • DocketSummons issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2013
  • DocketCase Management Conference - scheduled for 03/10/2014 at 08:45:00 AM in 41 at Stockton Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2013
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Holly, Carter. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2013
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Strange, Randall G on 10/10/2013. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2013
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Strange, Randall G on 10/10/2013. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2013
  • DocketComplaint filed by Strange, Randall G on 10/10/2013. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Julio A Hernandez

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Catharine A Ching

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alan Foutz

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adrienne E. Nordstrom