This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 03/17/2020 at 02:32:45 (UTC).

Radium2 Capital, Inc. vs Panfino Cafe et al.

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 Radium2 Capital, Inc filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against Panfino Cafe. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************5361

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Radium2 Capital, Inc.

Defendants

Panfino Cafe

Albarran, Jema

Soria, Phillip

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Berke, Michael N.

 

Court Documents

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of service of Application for Entry of Judgment as to Phillip Soria filed by Radium2 Capital, Inc.. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Judgment by Clerk on Sister State Judgment

Judgment for Radium2 Capital, Inc. against Panfino Cafe, Jema Albarran, Phillip Soria in the amount of $29,823.48. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Application for Entry of Sister-State Judgment

Application for Entry of Sister-State Judgment (Amount over $25,000) filed by Radium2 Capital, Inc.. Action Type: Application for Entry of Sister-State Judgment (Amount over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

MC012 Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment $0.00, Acknowledgment of Credit $0.00, and Declaration of Accrued Interest $580.13 filed by Radium2 Capital, Inc.. Action Type: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

EJ110 Notice of Entry of Judgment on Sister-State Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment on Sister-State Judgment filed by Radium2 Capital, Inc.. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Judgment on Sister-State Judgment; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of service filed by Radium2 Capital, Inc.. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of service of Application for Entry of Judgment on Sister-State Judgment filed by Radium2 Capital, Inc.. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Radium2 Capital, Inc.. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketWrit of Execution issued as to Jema Albarran on 02/20/2020 to Ventura County. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketWrit of Execution issued as to Phillip Soria on 02/20/2020 to Ventura County. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment Issued. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment Issued. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketPayment received by Inc. Radium2 Capital in the amount of $80.00. Receipt number 537640. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment $0.00, Acknowledgment of Credit $0.00, and Declaration of Accrued Interest $580.13 filed by Radium2 Capital, Inc.. Action Type: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of service filed by Radium2 Capital, Inc.. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of service of Application for Entry of Judgment as to Phillip Soria filed by Radium2 Capital, Inc.. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of service of Application for Entry of Judgment on Sister-State Judgment filed by Radium2 Capital, Inc.. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment for Radium2 Capital, Inc. against Panfino Cafe, Jema Albarran, Phillip Soria in the amount of $29,823.48. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment on Sister-State Judgment filed by Radium2 Capital, Inc.. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Judgment on Sister-State Judgment; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Entry of Sister-State Judgment (Amount over $25,000) filed by Radium2 Capital, Inc.. Action Type: Application for Entry of Sister-State Judgment (Amount over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Radium2 Capital, Inc.. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketAttorney, Michael N. Berke, retained for Radium2 Capital, Inc. . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketPayment received by Inc. Radium2 Capital in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 500727. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less