This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/17/2018 at 19:55:29 (UTC).

Pwu-Shiuan Chu vs Matthew Feske et al.

Case Summary

On 05/23/2017 Pwu-Shiuan Chu filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Matthew Feske. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Manteca Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Barrera, Gus. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************5181

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Barrera, Gus

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chu, Pwu-Shiuan

Defendants

Feske, Matthew

Conroy, Meghan

Other

Hill, Robin

 

Court Documents

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Barrera, Gus.

Proof of Service

Proof of personal Service of Amended Summons as to Meghan Conroy served on 05/26/2017. Fee 99.00 Judge: Barrera, Gus.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Matthew Feske served on 05/26/2017 by Personal Service. $99.00. Judge: Barrera, Gus.

Notice to Filing Party

Notice to Filing Party. Judge: Barrera, Gus.

Declaration for Issuance of Writ of Possession pursuant to CCP 712.010

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Chu, Pwu-Shiuan. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Barrera, Gus.

Writ Return

Writ of Possession as to Matthew Feske served on 06/26/2017 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Barrera, Gus.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default as to all occupants and Default Judgment filed by Chu, Pwu-Shiuan. Defakult entered as to all occupants. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Barrera, Gus.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Meghan Conroy Entered Judge: Barrera, Gus.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Amended Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Pwu-shiuan, Chu. Action Type: Amended; Judge: Barrera, Gus.

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/13/2017
View Court Documents

Writ of Possession as to Matthew Feske served on 06/26/2017 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Barrera, Gus.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2017

Writ of Possession as to Meghan Conroy and Matthew Feske served on 06/29/2017 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Barrera, Gus.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2017

Writ of Possession issued as to Meghan Conroy on 06/21/2017 to . Judge: Barrera, Gus.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2017

Writ of Possession issued as to Matthew Feske on 06/21/2017 to . Judge: Barrera, Gus.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2017

Payment received by Robin Hill in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 181626. Judge: Barrera, Gus.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2017

Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Barrera, Gus.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2017
View Court Documents

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Pwu-Shiuan Chu against Matthew Feske, Meghan Conroy filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Barrera, Gus.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2017
View Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default as to all occupants and Default Judgment filed by Chu, Pwu-Shiuan. Defakult entered as to all occupants. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Barrera, Gus.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2017
View Court Documents

Notice to Filing Party. Judge: Barrera, Gus.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2017
View Court Documents

Request for Dismissal Does filed by Chu, Pwu-Shiuan. Action Type: Request for Dismissal Does; Judge: Barrera, Gus.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
05/26/2017
View Court Documents

Amended Complaint filed by Pwu-shiuan, Chu. Action Type: Amended Complaint; Judge: Barrera, Gus.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2017
View Court Documents

Amended Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Pwu-shiuan, Chu. Action Type: Amended; Judge: Barrera, Gus.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2017
View Court Documents

Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Pwu-shiuan, Chu.. Fees have already been paid. Action Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Judge: Barrera, Gus.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2017
View Court Documents

Unlawful Detainer Notice to Filing Party. Judge: Barrera, Gus.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2017
View Court Documents

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Barrera, Gus.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2017

Case initiated. Judge: Barrera, Gus.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2017
View Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hill, Robin. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Barrera, Gus.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2017

Payment received by Robin Hill in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 171536. Judge: Barrera, Gus.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2017
View Court Documents

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Barrera, Gus.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2017
View Court Documents

Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Hill, Robin. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Barrera, Gus.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less