This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 03/07/2022 at 07:08:05 (UTC).

Progressive West Insurance Company vs Tyrone Heads

Case Summary

On 12/20/2021 Progressive West Insurance Company filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Tyrone Heads. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Waters, Robert T.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1851

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Waters, Robert T.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Progressive West Insurance Company

Defendant

Heads, Tyrone

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nivinskus, Mark Robert

 

Court Documents

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

Complaint

Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Progressive West Insurance Company.

Statement of Damages

Statement of Damages filed by Progressive West Insurance Company.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Progressive West Insurance Company.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Tyrone Heads served on 01/19/2022 by Personal Service. $99.00.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 11B; Judge: Robert T. Waters; Participants; Progressive West Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Tyrone Heads (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Tyrone Heads served on 01/19/2022 by Personal Service. $99.00.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 06/27/2022 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Robert T. Waters in Department 11B.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Progressive West Insurance Company.; Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Damages filed by Progressive West Insurance Company.; Action Type: Statement - (Other); Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Progressive West Insurance Company.; Action Type: Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Mark Robert Nivinskus, retained for Progressive West Insurance Company .; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Progressive West Insurance Company in the amount of $225.00. Receipt number 706174.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE WEST INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NIVINSKUS MARK ROBERT