Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 04/25/2019 at 02:58:04 (UTC).

Progressive West Insurance Company vs Edwin Laire Ebel

Case Summary

On 01/05/2017 Progressive West Insurance Company filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Edwin Laire Ebel. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Humphreys, Elizabeth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0084

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Humphreys, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Progressive West Insurance Company

Defendant

Ebel, Edwin Laire

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nivinskus, Mark Robert

 

Court Documents

JUD100 Judgment

Judgment for Progressive West Insurance Company against Edwin Laire Ebel in the amount of 20190.84. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal Does filed by Progressive West Insurance Company. Action Type: Request for Dismissal Does; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Declaration Pursuant to CCP 585

Declaration Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by Progressive West Insurance Company. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Edwin Laire Ebel Entered Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Edwin Laire Ebel served on 01/20/2017 by Personal Service. $79.00. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Complaint

Complaint Motor Vehicle-Property Damage; Personal Injury; Uninsured Motorist filed by Progressive West Insurance Company. Action Type: Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000); Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Statement of Damages

Statement of Damages filed by Progressive West Insurance Company. Action Type: Statement - (Other); Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Progressive West Insurance Company. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2018
  • Payment received in the amount of $26.00, receipt number 269119. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DL-30 Issued. Action Type: Certificate of facts regarding unsatisfied judgment (DL30); Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • Withholding revoked Action Type: Certificate of facts regarding unsatisfied judgment (DL30); Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • Payment received by Progressive West Insurance Company in the amount of $15.00. Receipt number 269118. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • Abstract of Judgment Issued. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • Payment received by Progressive West Insurance Company in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 254950. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • Hearing Result: CMC Vacated Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment for Progressive West Insurance Company against Edwin Laire Ebel in the amount of 20190.84. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Default against Edwin Laire Ebel Entered Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Edwin Laire Ebel served on 01/20/2017 by Personal Service. $79.00. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 07/10/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Elizabeth Humphreys in Department 22. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • Attorney, Mark Robert Nivinskus, retained for Progressive West Insurance Company . Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • Case initiated. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Damages filed by Progressive West Insurance Company. Action Type: Statement - (Other); Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Motor Vehicle-Property Damage; Personal Injury; Uninsured Motorist filed by Progressive West Insurance Company. Action Type: Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000); Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • Payment received by Progressive West Insurance Company in the amount of $370.00. Receipt number 131315. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Progressive West Insurance Company. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE WEST INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NIVINSKUS MARK ROBERT